California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04618
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:26 AM PST
Defendant
Project Ether Limited
Defendant
Haris Bin Zafar
Plaintiff
Kevin Gelasio
Represented By
Brandon Orewyler
Miller Barondess, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 15, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/15 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Kevin Gelasio (Orewyler, Brandon)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 09/15 7:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 12:22 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/14/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 09/14 11:27 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/14 10:25 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Gelasio.. (Orewyler, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Project Ether Limited, Haris Bin Zafar.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/11 1:22 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/08 2:23 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/08 2:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Orewyler, Brandon)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/08 1:58 PM
Proposed Summons. (Orewyler, Brandon)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18626949.). Filed byKEVIN GELASIO.(Orewyler, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet