California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:23-cv-04595
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Sep 14, 2023
Case in other court:Georgia Northern, 1:22-cv-02545
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:26 AM PST
Defendant
Bryan Keding
Represented By
Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Stites & Harbison PLLC
contact info
Terence I. Rayner
Law Offices Of Terence Rayner
contact info
Evan Walker Elam
Stites & Harbison, Atlanta Office
contact info
Defendant
Tim Keding
Represented By
Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Stites & Harbison PLLC
contact info
Terence I. Rayner
Law Offices Of Terence Rayner
contact info
Evan Walker Elam
Stites & Harbison, Atlanta Office
contact info
Defendant
Keding Corporation
Represented By
Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Stites & Harbison PLLC
contact info
Terence I. Rayner
Law Offices Of Terence Rayner
contact info
Evan Walker Elam
Stites & Harbison, Atlanta Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Floorcoverings International, Ltd.
Represented By
Jonathan Nussbaum
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Carrie A. Shufflebarger
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Jean-Alain Schneider
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Jenna Schneider
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Jodi Krystyn Swick
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
66 66 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 09/13 4:23 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION [FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)] filed by Floorcoverings International, Ltd.. (Swick, Jodi)
Related: [-]
65 65 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/13 4:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Floorcoverings International, Ltd... (Swick, Jodi)
Related: [-]
64 64 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/13 4:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Floorcoverings International, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent FS Brands, Inc. for Floorcoverings International, Ltd.. (Swick, Jodi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
63 63 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/12 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi Krystyn Swick (Swick, Jodi)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
62 62 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 09/08 4:18 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the court has scheduled a Status Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Status Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
61 61 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 09/08 4:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2023 . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
60 60 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 09/08 2:31 PM
Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-02545. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
59 59 ORDER granting58 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Injunction and Transfer. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/6/2023. (jra)
Related: [-]
58 58 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Injunction and Transfer by Floorcoverings International, Ltd..(Schneider, Jean-Alain)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Injunction & Order of Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a)
Submission of56 MOTION to Amend Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. (jra)
Related: [-]