California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04616
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Sep 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:26 AM PST
Defendant
Pacific Maritime Association
Plaintiff
Barry Thomas
1643 Notre Dame Avenue
East Palo Alto, CA 94303

GPO Sep 20 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 9/20/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/20/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order Wed 10/09 1:02 PM
ORDER re 19 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Barry Thomas. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/9/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
19 19 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Wed 10/02 4:10 PM
RESPONSE re18 Order, by Barry Thomas. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/26 4:14 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 9/26/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Case Management Conference - Further Thu 09/26 3:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trina L Thompson: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom webinar on 9/26/2024. The pro se plaintiff is not present at the time the case is called. The defendant has not been served or service has not been requested. The Court dismisses the case for lack of prosecution without prejudice. Total Time in Court: 2 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. Plaintiff: Not present. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Date Filed: 9/26/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 09/20 4:21 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 9/20/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
15 15 9 pgs order Order Mon 08/05 5:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION; SCREENING ORDER REVIEWING12 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 8/5/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
14 14 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/21 9:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trina L Thompson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2024. Plaintiff is not present at the time the case is called. Amended complaint filed on 6/3/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2024. Total Time in Court: 1 minute. Court Reporter: Not reported. Plaintiff: Not present. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Date Filed: 6/20/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
13 13 order Order Fri 06/14 1:24 PM
ORDER: A case management conference is scheduled for Thursday, June 20, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. The parties did not file a joint case management statement as required under Judge Thompson's Civil Standing Order. See Judge Thompson's Civil Standing Order at Para. 12. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint case management statement by Tuesday, June 18, 2024. Failure to timely file a joint case management statement may result in the case management conference being continued and an order to show cause. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on June 14, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/03 5:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pacific Maritime Association. Filed by Barry Thomas. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/28 7:38 AM
REFERRAL TO THE HELP DESK, OSC-POSSIBLE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 5/24/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 05/07 11:40 AM
CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
9 9 misc Received Document Mon 11/06 1:58 PM
Received Document: Waiver of the Service of Summons by Barry Thomas.(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/12 12:21 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 10/12 10:04 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/11 11:00 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barry Thomas..(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, September 29, 2023
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 09/29 1:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/13/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/20 3:46 PM
ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Amended Complaint due by 10/30/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/08 5:06 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/08 5:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Barry Thomas. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Pacific Maritime Association (Filing fee $ 402.). Filed byBarry Thomas. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2023.(sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet