Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:23-bk-11434
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Mar 21, 2024

Debtor
AlphaFlow Inc.
564 Market Street Suite 450
San Francisco, CA 94104
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David W. Carickhoff
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP 1313 N. Market Street Suite 5400
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 08/22/2024 3:28 PM EDT
Friday, September 08, 2023
1 1 misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 09/08 10:21 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Amount Paid $338. Filed by AlphaFlow Inc.. (Rosner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Verification of Creditor Matrix
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/08 10:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-11434 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A11245373, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]