Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Douglas L Lutz
Case #: 5:23-bk-51045
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Dismissed:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
American Transport LLC
123 Augusta Drive
Winchester, KY 40391
Represented By
Noah R. Friend
Noah R. Friend Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507
Represented By
Bradley M. Nerderman
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/07/2023 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, September 08, 2023
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 09/08 2:45 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-51045 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A11561939, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 09/08 2:44 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount 1738 Filed by American Transport LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 12/7/2023. (Friend, Noah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Fri 09/08 2:56 PM
Corporate Resolution, filed by American Transport LLC. (Friend, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Corporate Resolution
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 09/08 2:58 PM
Equity Security Holders , filed by American Transport LLC. (Friend, Noah)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 09/08 3:01 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement, filed by American Transport LLC.. (Friend, Noah)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Fri 09/08 3:11 PM
Notice of Filing of Evidence of Liens in Cash Collateral Filed by American Transport LLC. (Friend, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Finite 220 Trust
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Global Merchant Cash Inc
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Lendr. Online LLC
Att: 4 Exhibit D - CT Corp System
Att: 5 Exhibit E - CT Corp System
6 6 6 pgs motion Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Fri 09/08 3:23 PM
Application to Employ Noah R. Friend Law Firm as Counsel for Debtor in Possession. Last day to file objections: 9/29/2023 . (Friend, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Noah R. Friend
Att: 2 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 09/08 3:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley M. Nerderman Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley)
Related: [-]