New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis A Kaplan
Case #: 1:23-cv-07284
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Terminated:Apr 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
Praveen Kumar Sharma
Defendant
Pooja Sharma
Defendant
Pooja Bisht
Defendant
Aurum Amb LLC
Defendant
Ank Exim LLC
Defendant
Pritam Singh
Defendant
Life of Riley International Inc.
Defendant
Life of Riley Private Limited
Defendant
Storemate Kart Services PVT LTD
Defendant
Anshoo Sharma
Defendant
Anindita Mahanta
Defendant
Twiq Export PVT LTD
Defendant
Khaled Hasan
Defendant
IIZ Forwarding LLC
Defendant
Saman Naaz
Defendant
Westpvtltd LLC
Defendant
Does 1-50
Defendant
Ankush Sharma
Defendant
Zyrus eRetail Private Limited
Defendant
Nasima Akhter
Defendant
Mohd Kashif Rashid
Interested Party
Customs and Border Protection
Represented By
Alexander Kristofcak
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sourcebooks, LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Springer Publishing Company, LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Taylor & Francis Group LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Zondervan Corporation LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
W.W. Norton & Company, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wolters Kluwer Health, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Wiley and Sons, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
American Heart Association, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cengage Learning Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elsevier B.V.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elsevier Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MacMillan Holdings LLC.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
McGraw Hill LLC.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pearson Education Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Penguin Random House LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
American Psychiatric Association
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
American Psychological Association, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Guilford Publications, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HarperCollins Publishers LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jones & Bartlett Learning, LLC
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Liveright Publishing Corporation
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
No Starch Press, Inc.
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Penguin Books Limited Company
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Daryl Lian Kleiman
Oppenheim And Zebrak, LLP
contact info
Corey Michael Sclar Miller
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP
contact info
Danae Tinelli
Oppenheim And Zebrak LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rajiv Kumar
Terminated: 10/05/2023
Defendant
Anil Kumar
Terminated: 10/05/2023
Defendant
Kouros Shahidi Ghamsari
Terminated: 09/21/2023
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 09/06/2023
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 09/06/2023
Represented By
Michele Harrington Murphy
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
184 184 12 pgs order Amended Judgment Fri 01/24 3:26 PM
ORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT amending181 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, in favor of American Academy of Pediatrics, American Heart Association, Inc., American Psychiatric Association, American Psychological Association, Inc., Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group LLC, Cengage Learning Inc., Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Guilford Publications, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers LLC, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., Jones & Bartlett Learning, LLC, Liveright Publishing Corporation, MacMillan Holdings LLC., McGraw Hill LLC., No Starch Press, Inc., Pearson Education Inc., Penguin Books Limited Company, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc., Sourcebooks, LLC, Springer Publishing Company, LLC, Taylor & Francis Group LLC, The Zondervan Corporation LLC, W.W. Norton & Company, Inc., Wolters Kluwer Health, Inc. against Ank Exim LLC, Aurum Amb LLC, Doe Defendant d/b/a Klas Consulting, Does 1-50, IIZ Forwarding LLC, Khaled Hasan, Life of Riley International Inc., Life of Riley Private Limited, Storemate Kart Services PVT LTD, Twiq Export PVT LTD, Westpvtltd LLC, Zyrus eRetail Private Limited, Anindita Mahanta, Ankush Sharma, Anshoo Sharma, Mohd Kashif Rashid, Nasima Akhter, Pooja Bisht, Pooja Sharma, Praveen Kumar Sharma, Pritam Singh, Saman Naaz. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion Dkt. 177 is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appendix D to the Court's April 22, 2024 Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Post-Judgment Relief Order (ECF No. 170) ("Default Judgment") is amended, as requested in Plaintiffs' Motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the First Amended Appendix D, which is attached hereto, replaces and supersedes Appendix D to the Current Injunction. It is SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/17/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
183 183 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 2:59 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, On January 17, 2025, the Court issued an order amending judgment. Dkt 181. The filed copy of that order inadvertently omitted a portion of Appendix D appended to the order. Attached is the order amending judgment. The Clerk shall file it in place of the incomplete version filed on January 17. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/24/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
182 182 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 01/22 3:22 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Danae Tinelli dated January 22, 2025 re: complete attachment re Appendix D. Document filed by Pearson Education Inc., W.W. Norton & Company, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc., Jones & Bartlett Learning, LLC, Liveright Publishing Corporation, Guilford Publications, Inc., American Academy of Pediatrics, American Heart Association, Inc., Taylor & Francis Group LLC, Springer Publishing Company, LLC, Wolters Kluwer Health, Inc., Penguin Books Limited Company, American Psychiatric Association, HarperCollins Publishers LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, No Starch Press, Inc., Sourcebooks, LLC, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., Bedford, Freeman & Worth Publishing Group LLC, The Zondervan Corporation LLC, MacMillan Holdings LLC., Cengage Learning Inc., Elsevier Inc., Elsevier B.V., McGraw Hill LLC...(Tinelli, Danae)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
181 181 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 01/17 4:45 PM
ORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT granting177 Motion to Amend/Correct170 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion Dkt. 177 is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appendix D to the Court's April 22, 2024 Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Post-Judgment Relief Order (ECF No. 170) ("Default Judgment") is amended, as requested in Plaintiffs' Motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the First Amended Appendix D, which is attached hereto, replaces and supersedes Appendix D to the Current Injunction. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/17/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 01/17 11:38 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 178 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]