Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:23-cv-04027
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
ALM Automotive Group LLC
Represented By
JonVieve Hill
Fisher & Phillips Llp-Atl
contact info
Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Alliance Cars LLC
Represented By
JonVieve Hill
Fisher & Phillips Llp-Atl
contact info
Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc
Represented By
JonVieve Hill
Fisher & Phillips Llp-Atl
contact info
Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Khushwant Bhatia
Represented By
JonVieve Hill
Fisher & Phillips Llp-Atl
contact info
Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Chelsea Davis
Represented By
James William Clifton
The Clifton Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 11, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/11 11:28 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Chelsea Davis. (Clifton, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
order Order Thu 10/10 11:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). Based on the Parties' announcement of reaching a settlement [Doc. 19], the Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close this case. If settlement finalization fails, either Party may move to reopen this case. The Parties are ORDERED to file appropriate documents disposing of this case within thirty (30) days of this order. If the Parties require additional time, they shall move for such additional time to finalize the settlement. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/10/24. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/10 12:26 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker terminated from case. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 08/13 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia (Simpson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 07/01 4:22 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Stay. The parties will notify the Court about the outcome of the mediation within five (5) days of the mediation and, if the mediation is unsuccessful, will submit a Scheduling Order within ten (10) days of the mediation extending the current discovery deadline by ninety (90) days and extending any corresponding deadlines to file dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 07/01/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
17 17 motion Stay Thu 06/27 10:48 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Case and Hold Judicial Proceedings in Abeyance Pending Mediation by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia.(Hill, JonVieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 20, 2024
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Thu 06/20 9:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Defendants' Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents; Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia.(Simpson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Tue 04/23 1:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Chelsea Davis.(Clifton, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/25 4:28 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. It is hereby ordered that discovery shall be extended, through and including July 10, 2024, and the parties shall file any summary judgment motions within thirty (30)days of the new discovery deadline (i.e. on or before August 9, 2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 3/25/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/20 4:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Corresponding Deadlines by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia.(Hill, JonVieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Sunday, February 04, 2024
12 12 discov Certificate of Service Sun 02/04 11:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea Davis.(Clifton, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Thu 02/01 11:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Khushwant Bhatia.(Simpson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/18 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea Davis.(Clifton, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service to Defendants for First Set of Admissions,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service to Defendants for first set of Ineterragotories,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service to Defendants for First set of Request for Production
Thursday, December 14, 2023
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/14 3:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND GUIDELINES: re:7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: Discovery will end on April 11, 2024. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by May 13, 2024, and if the parties do not move for summary judgment, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due May 15, 2024. The Clerk is directed to submit this action by May 17, 2024, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/14/23. (ces)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
8 8 discov Certificate of Service Wed 12/13 4:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re Discovery Requests to Plaintiff and Defendants' Initial Disclosures by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia.(Simpson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 12/13 3:17 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia. (Simpson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/15 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JonVieve Hill on behalf of ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia (Hill, JonVieve)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/13 11:11 AM
First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia. (Simpson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/13 11:08 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT and Additional Defenses by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia. Discovery ends on 4/11/2024.(Simpson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 11/13 11:17 AM
Clerk's Notation re5 First Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 09/12 9:16 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to ALM Automotive Group LLC, Alliance Cars LLC, Atlanta Luxury Motors, Inc, Khushwant Bhatia.(ces)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Bhatia,
Att: 2 Summons Alliance Cars LLC,
Att: 3 Summons ALM Automotive Group LLC
Friday, September 08, 2023
2 2 service Proposed Summons Fri 09/08 10:52 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Chelsea Davis(Clifton, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summon for Defendant,
Att: 2 Summons Summon for Defendant,
Att: 3 Summons Summon for Defendant
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Chelsea Davis. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12871559)(tht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet