Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Lee H Rosenthal
Case #: 4:23-cv-03365
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Nov 17, 2023
Case in other court:Harris County 215th District Court, 23-57891
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 3:49 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
BAC North America Holding Company
Conflict Check Party
Bank of America Corporation
Conflict Check Party
John M. Kimbro
Conflict Check Party
Matthew Durham
Conflict Check Party
McGuire Woods LLP
Conflict Check Party
NB Holdings Corporation
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
PO Box 26012
Greensboro, NC 27420
Represented By
Addison Eleanor Fontein
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Matthew David Durham
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John M Kimbro, Jr
1 Central Park South Apt. 706
New York, NY 10019


Docket last updated: 03/16/2025 2:36 AM CDT
Friday, September 08, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County, Texas 215th District Court, case number 2023-57891 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30486927) filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Fontein, Addison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A., filed.(Fontein, Addison)
Related: [-]