Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00481
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Brandon Adams (1)
Represented By
Craig J. Concannon
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John J. Ware
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/10/2023 2:56 AM CDT
Thursday, September 07, 2023
Warrant Issued as to Information in case as to Brandon Adams. (DLB)
Related: [-]
Arrest of defendant Brandon Adams date of arrest: 9/7/2023 (TMT)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs INFORMATION as to Brandon Adams (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (DLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE John J. Ware appearing for USA. (DLB)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Brandon Adams (DLB)
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp: Arraignment and Plea: Parties present for arraignment and plea on 9/7/2023. Defendant sworn. The Court finds the defendant competent to enter a plea of guilty. Defendant waives reading of indictment and enters plea of guilty as to Counts one, two, and three of Criminal Information. The Court accepts the guilty plea. The guilty plea agreement is also accepted. (Objections to Presentence Report due by 11/20/2023. Sentencing set for 12/4/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.) (Court Reporter:Gayle Madden, Gayle_Madden@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7987) (proceedings started: 1:31 pm) (proceedings ended: 2:10 pm)(Deputy Clerk: T. Tillman) (Defendant Location: BOND) (Appearance for Government: John Ware)(Appearance for Defendant: Craig Concannon) (TMT)
Related: [-]
5 5 GUILTY PLEA AGREEMENT by USA, Brandon Adams as to Brandon Adams (TMT)
Related: [-]
6 6 GUILTY PLEA AGREEMENT SUPPLEMENT as to Brandon Adams (TMT)
Related: [-]
7 7 Personal Recognizance Bond Entered as to defendant Brandon Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker on 9/7/2023. (BRP)
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker: Initial Appearance/Rule 5 as to Brandon Adams held on 9/7/2023. Defendant advised of rights and indicated an understanding of those rights. Court to appoint: CJA. Bond Execution Hearing as to Brandon Adams held on 9/7/2023. Defendant sworn. Bond set in the amount of: O/R. Bond papers executed. (proceedings started: 2:44 pm-2:58 pm) (proceedings ended: 3:13 pm-3:18 pm)(FTR Gold Operator Initials: JParker) (Defendant Location: RELEASED BOND) (Appearance for Government: John J. Ware)(Appearance for Defendant: Craig J. Concannon) (JMP)
Related: [-]
9 9 DUE PROCESS DOCKET TEXT ORDER as to Brandon Adams: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence -- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker on 9/7/2023. (JMP)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Brandon Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph S. Dueker on 9/7/2023. (BRP)
Related: [-]
11 11 Rule 5 papers prepared by the judge as to Brandon Adams. (BRP)
Related: [-]