Virginia Western District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-00056
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2023
Terminated:Sep 27, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 11/17/2023 5:43 PM EST
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
PC Arrest of Laqueshia Chanice Burgess (kld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess. (skm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 SEALED Pretrial Bail Report as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess. (ji)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Initial Appearance as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess held on 9/7/2023, Bond Hearing as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess held on 9/7/2023. Defendant remanded to Custody. (FTR Operator: Karen Dotson)(skm)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess. (skm)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs FTR Log Notes as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess for Initial Appearance and Bond Hearing in the Charlottesville Division in CR1 held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/7/2023. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Karen Dotson. (skm)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL ORDER as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess that pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83(1963), and its progeny. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/7/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (skm)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/7/2023.(skm)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess (CUSTODY) (FTR): Preliminary Hearing set for 9/12/2023 02:00 PM in Charlottesville before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.(skm)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 20 as to Laqueshia Chanice Burgess: Appointment of Attorney Paul Graham Beers, Esq.. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/7/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (jv)
Related: [-]