California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:23-cv-04624
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC
Represented By
Laura Marie Harris
Remy Thomas Et Al
contact info
Howard Francis Wilkins, III
Remy Moose Manley, LLP
contact info
Defendant
County of Marin
Represented By
Brandon William Halter
Marin County Counsel'S Office
contact info
Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Marin County Counsel'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Hymel
Represented By
Brandon William Halter
Marin County Counsel'S Office
contact info
Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Marin County Counsel'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Marin County Pacific Associates
Represented By
Laura Marie Harris
Remy Thomas Et Al
contact info
Howard Francis Wilkins, III
Remy Moose Manley, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pacific West Communities, Inc.
Represented By
Laura Marie Harris
Remy Thomas Et Al
contact info
Howard Francis Wilkins, III
Remy Moose Manley, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Golden Gate Village Resident Council
Represented By
Kevin T. Haroff
Haroff Law P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
40 40 minutes Case Management Conference - Further ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 05/08 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/7/2025. By then next case management conference, the parties should present a plan that resolves this case. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2025. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 9/8/2025 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kevin Haroff. Attorney for Defendant: Brandon Halter for County of Marin, Matthew Hymel; Laura Middleton for Marin County Pacific Assoc., Pacific West Communities, Affordable Housing Land Consultants. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2025)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
39 39 misc Case Management Statement Mon 04/28 2:41 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc., Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC. (Harris, Laura) Modified on 4/28/2025 (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/28 3:11 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:39 Case Management Statement filed by Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc., Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 03/24 10:55 AM
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice to refiling should the stay in this case be lifted. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/05 10:55 AM
Order. Signed 11/5/2024 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 36 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Extending Stay of Proceedings.(klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/05 9:06 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Extend Stay of Proceedings filed by Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc., Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC.(Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
oth_evt ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/05 10:57 AM
See Order37 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2025. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 5/7/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A joint list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 4/5/2025 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (klh, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/5/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
35 35 misc Case Management Statement Wed 10/30 6:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 07/08 4:41 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 33 Stipulation to Stay Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 11/1/2024 is continued to 11/6/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 07/08 1:43 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment in Pursuance of Settlement; Declaration of Laura M. Middleton in Support Thereof filed by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc..(Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/27 11:21 AM
Order. Signed, as modified on 3/27/2024, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 31 Second Stipulation Extending Briefing Deadlines and First Continuation of Hearing Date for Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment.(klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
oth_evt ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Set Deadlines/Hearings Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/27 11:35 AM
See Order32 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment due by 8/5/2024. Responses/Opposition due by 8/5/2024 as to 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 8/19/2024 as to 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Opposition/Responses to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/16/2024. Replies to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/30/2024. Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2024. Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing as to 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re-set for 11/1/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A joint list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10/31/2024 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
31 31 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 03/26 4:29 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines and First Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date for Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; Dec of Harris in Support Thereof filed by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc..(Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 23, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 02/23 2:56 PM
Order. Signed 2/23/2024 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 29 Stipulation Extending Briefing Deadlines for Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment.(klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/23 3:06 PM
See Order30 Set Deadlines/Hearings: as to 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Defendants' Opposition/Responses to 27 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/5/2024. Defendants' Cross Motions Summary Judgment due by 4/5/2024. Plaintiff's Replies to 27 Motion for Summary Judgement due by 4/19/2024. Plaintiff's Opposition/ Responses to Defendants' Cross-Motion due by 5/6/2024. Defendants' Replies to Cross-Motion due by 5/20/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
29 29 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 02/21 5:38 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines for Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; Declaration of Laura M. Harris in Support Thereof filed by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc..(Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2024
28 28 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/12 1:52 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing as to 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 6/21/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 6/19/2024 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . The briefing schedule remains unchanged pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-7(d). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 02/12 1:43 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Golden Gate Village Resident Council. Filer did not pick a motion hearing date, which is required. The pleading indicates a hearing date of Monday, May 13, 2024 at 2:00 PM which is incorrect. Judge Spero hears civil motions on Fridays at 9:30 AM by Zoom Webinar. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Wed 02/07 2:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Golden Gate Village Resident Council. Responses due by 2/21/2024. Replies due by 2/28/2024.(Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Decl. of Kevin Haroff,
Att: 2 Declaration Decl. of Royce McLemore,
Att: 3 Declaration Decl of Marilyln Mackel,
Att: 4 Declaration Decl. of Juanita Douglas,
Att: 5 Supplement Req. for Judicial Notice,
Att: 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service
Friday, January 05, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/05 11:44 AM
NOTICE by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing and Lodging of the Certified Administrative Record of Proceedings (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
25 25 misc Status Report Fri 12/22 9:59 AM
STATUS REPORT re Construction of Drake Avenue Apartments by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
24 24 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 12/18 9:57 AM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2023. The Developers are ordered to advise the parties within one week from today (12/15/2023) whether they plan to begin construction anytime before the hearing to be scheduled in this matter. The Administrative Record shall be filed on 1/8/2024. The briefing schedule begins as of 1/8/2024. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kevin Haroff. Attorney for Defendant: Brandon Halter for County of Marin & Matthew Hymel; Laura Harris Middleton for Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities & Affordable Housing Land Consultants (the "Developers"). (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2023)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 12/08 10:00 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:23 Case Management Statement filed by Golden Gate Village Resident Council (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
23 23 misc Case Management Statement Thu 12/07 9:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint CMS filed by Golden Gate Village Resident Council. (Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 12/04 2:43 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12/13/2023 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/28 11:19 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
20 20 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 11/27 11:02 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
19 19 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/14 10:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Marin, Matthew Hymel.. (Halter, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 12, 2023
18 18 service Certificate/Proof of Service Sun 11/12 5:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Golden Gate Village Resident Council (Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 10/31 8:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants County of Marin and Matthew Hymel shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/30 1:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by County of Marin, Matthew Hymel. (Halter, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
15 15 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 10/27 11:25 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of County of Marin and Mathew Hymel (Halter, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/26 4:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc... (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 10/18 7:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Golden Gate Village Resident Council identifying Corporate Parent Golden Gate Village Resident Council for Golden Gate Village Resident Council. re1 Complaint, (Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10/12 2:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc., & Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
11 11 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 10/11 6:01 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific West Communities, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cogency Global Inc., Other Affiliate TPC Holdings IX, LLC, Other Affiliate Central Valley Coalition for Affordable Housing for Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 10/11 5:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Marin County Pacific Associates identifying Other Affiliate Cogency Global Inc., Other Affiliate TPC Holdings IX, LLC, Other Affiliate Central Valley Coalition for Affordable Housing for Marin County Pacific Associates. (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 10/11 5:56 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Cogency Global Inc., Other Affiliate TPC Holdings IX, LLC, Other Affiliate Central Valley Coalition for Affordable Housing for Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC. (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/11 5:48 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief byAffordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (Harris, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 10/06 12:59 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re:7 Certificate of Service filed by Golden Gate Village Resident Council (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 10/05 6:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Golden Gate Village Resident Council (Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/26 9:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Gate Village Resident Council.. (Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, County of Marin, Matthew Hymel, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/11 11:10 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 10:17 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/08 7:17 PM
Proposed Summons. (Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 7:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18628113.). Filed byGolden Gate Village Resident Council.(Haroff, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet