California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 4:23-cv-04626
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
Represented By
Gayle Rosenstein Klein
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Robert Barton
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tony Mata
Represented By
Craig Shunji Momita
Arias Sanguinetti Wang & Torrijos, LLP
contact info
Mickel Arias
Arias Sanguinetti Wang & Torrijos, LLP
contact info
Michael Anthony Jenkins
Arias Sanguinetti Wang & Torrijos, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 11, 2023
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/11 5:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc.. Filed by Tony Mata. (Jenkins, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 12/11 4:38 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/04 4:47 PM
NOTICE by Tesla, Inc. of Lodging(Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Administrative Motion
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 11/29 9:59 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Stipulation to Request an Order to Adjourn Deadlines. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/28 5:35 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Request an Order to Adjourn Deadlines filed by Tesla, Inc..(Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gayle Klein in Support of Stipulation,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/28 5:28 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Tesla, Inc. (Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/28 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gayle Rosenstein Klein (Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 11/22 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Mata. Tesla, Inc. served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tony Mata (Jenkins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 11/17 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
10 10 misc Proposed Summons Thu 11/16 3:16 PM
Proposed Summons. (Jenkins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Fri 10/27 8:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for December 12, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by December 5th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-cv-04626-HSG. The December 12, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/26 3:49 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 10/26/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 10/26 2:52 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/26 1:04 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tony Mata.. (Jenkins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10/12 8:57 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 09/26 9:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/11 12:10 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 9:15 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 7:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Tony Mata ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18628223.). Filed byTony Mata.(Arias, Mickel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet