New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Vera M Scanlon
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:14-cv-06410
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2014
Terminated:Oct 17, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 11:52 PM EDT
Defendant
Sandcastle Towers Housing Development Fund Corp.
Represented By
Richard T. Walsh
Horing Welikson & Rosen, P.C.
contact info
Jann S. Brent
Horing Welikson & Rosen, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sarasota Gold LLC
Represented By
Richard T. Walsh
Horing Welikson & Rosen, P.C.
contact info
Jann S. Brent
Horing Welikson & Rosen, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Weissman Realty Group LLC
Represented By
Richard T. Walsh
Horing Welikson & Rosen, P.C.
contact info
Jann S. Brent
Horing Welikson & Rosen, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
E & M Associates LLC
Plaintiff
The Fortune Society
Represented By
Jia Cobb
Relman, Dane & Colfax PLLC
contact info
Ryan Chasce Downer
Relman, Dane & Colfax
contact info
Glenn Schlactus
Relman & Dane, PLLC
contact info
John P. Relman
Relman, Dane & Colfax PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Thursday, October 17, 2019
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/17 8:54 AM
The Stipulation of dismissal at145 is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/17/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
146 146 misc Status Report Wed 10/16 2:56 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Letter) by The Fortune Society (Schlactus, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
145 145 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/11 12:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by The Fortune Society (Schlactus, Glenn)
Related: [-]