Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Case #: 1:23-cv-23455
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Julianne Bagley
contact info
Amy Lynn Soto
Doj-Usao
contact info
Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Attorney General of the United States
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Julianne Bagley
contact info
Amy Lynn Soto
Doj-Usao
contact info
Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Julianne Bagley
contact info
Amy Lynn Soto
Doj-Usao
contact info
Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Julianne Bagley
contact info
Amy Lynn Soto
Doj-Usao
contact info
Felipe Plechac-Diaz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Noel Ricardo Stephens
18201 SW 12 St
Miami, FL 33194
Represented By
Krista Ann Dolan
Southern Poverty Law Center
contact info
Rose Murray
Southern Poverty Law Center
contact info
Felix Alberto Montanez
Southern Poverty Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 19, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 04/22 9:26 AM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON JOINT STIPULATION: re35 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions in this case are DENIED as MOOT, and this case is CLOSED. Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 04/19 4:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Soto, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 04/18 11:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Soto, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
34 34 misc Status Report Thu 03/07 12:36 PM
STATUS REPORT by Noel Ricardo Stephens(Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Immigration Court Hearing Cancellation,
Att: 2 Exhibit EOIR Case Notes
Thursday, February 08, 2024
33 33 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendations Thu 02/08 11:26 PM
OBJECTIONS to28 Report and Recommendations by Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Soto, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
32 32 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendations Wed 02/07 10:32 PM
OBJECTIONS to28 Report and Recommendations by Noel Ricardo Stephens. (Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 02/05 11:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION for Discovery filed by Noel Ricardo Stephens. (Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 01/29 6:00 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Petitioner's29 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Petitioner may file his Reply in support of his18 Motion for Leave on or before February 5, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 1/29/2024. (as06)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time Mon 01/29 3:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery re27 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Noel Ricardo Stephens. Responses due by 2/12/2024. (Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/30 8:25 AM
Reset Deadline per DE#30 as to18 MOTION for Discovery. Replies due by 2/5/2024. (scn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
28 28 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 01/25 9:36 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2241: For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No.1 ), filed by Petitioner Noel Ricardo Stephens, should be GRANTED, in part. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 1/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/24 8:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION for Discovery filed by Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Replies due by 1/31/2024. (Soto, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 01/22 8:57 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents, Garrett J. Ripa, in his official capacity as Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office; Patrick Lechleitner, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; Alejandro Mayorkas, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security; and Merrick Garland, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States, shall respond to Petitioners Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery on or before January 24, 2024 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/22/2024. (jck)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/19 6:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time RESPOND TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY by Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Responses due by 2/2/2024.(Soto, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Wed 01/17 3:10 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,,, by Noel Ricardo Stephens (Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
22 22 minutes Writ Hearing Wed 01/10 12:48 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Oral Argument on15 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Hearing held on 1/9/2024. Matter taken under advisement. Total time in court: 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Amy Lynn Soto, Felix Alberto Montanez. Other Appearances: Petitioner Noel Ricardo Stephens. (Digital 10:15:16) (aw)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 01/09 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Compliance re20 Order on Motion to Seal. The Clerk has sealed ECF Nos. 1-19, 18, 18-1, 18-3, 18-4, 18-5, 18-7, 18-8, 18-13, 18-14, 18-15, 18-16, 18-17 and 18-18. (scn)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 01/09 3:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING17 MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Reassignment of AUSA/AFPD Tue 01/09 2:29 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Assistant U.S. Attorney by Amy Lynn Soto on behalf of Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Julianne Bagley representing Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office (Defendant) and Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Defendant) and Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Defendant); and Attorney General of the United States (Defendant); terminated.. Attorney Amy Lynn Soto added to party Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Lynn Soto added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Lynn Soto added to party Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Lynn Soto added to party Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Soto, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
18 18 motion Discovery Mon 01/08 4:25 PM
MOTION for Discovery by Noel Ricardo Stephens. Responses due by 1/22/2024(Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18
17 17 motion Motion to Seal (Public) Mon 01/08 4:17 PM
MOTION to Seal and Redact Certain Public Documents per Local Rule 5.4 by Noel Ricardo Stephens. (Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 1-19 Release Plan,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 01, 2023
16 16 order Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 12/01 4:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Motion to Set Oral Argument. It is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner Noel Ricardo Stephens's15 Unopposed Motion to Schedule Oral Argument is GRANTED. Oral Argument on the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, under 28 U.S.C. § 2241, is now set before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge for Tuesday, January 9, 2024, at 10:15 A.M. in Miami Division at the C. Clyde Atkins United States Courthouse, 11th Floor, 301 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida 33128. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 12/1/2023. (elm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
15 15 motion Hearing Wed 11/08 11:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Hearing and Oral Argument by Noel Ricardo Stephens. (Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
14 14 misc Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 10/26 11:29 PM
REPLY to13 Response to Order to Show Cause, by Noel Ricardo Stephens.(Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit BIA Remand dated October 4, 2023,
Att: 2 Exhibit Arizona Superior Court Records
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 10/12 4:25 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re10 Order to Show Cause,, Terminate Motions, by Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Attorney General of the United States.(Bagley, Julianne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Reassignment of AUSA/AFPD Wed 10/04 2:44 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Assistant U.S. Attorney by Julianne Bagley on behalf of Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz representing Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office (Defendant) and Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Defendant) and Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Defendant); and Attorney General of the United States (Defendant); terminated.. Attorney Julianne Bagley added to party Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Julianne Bagley added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Julianne Bagley added to party Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Julianne Bagley added to party Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Bagley, Julianne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/03 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Felipe Plechac-Diaz on behalf of Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Field Office Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Miami Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Plechac-Diaz, Felipe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 09/22 9:37 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Granting in part5 MOTION to Expedite and for Order to Show Cause filed by Noel Ricardo Stephens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 9/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Thu 09/21 9:45 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 9/20/2023. Judge K. Michael Moore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/14/2023 and by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
4 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rose Murray. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16907859 by Noel Ricardo Stephens. Responses due by 9/25/2023(Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
3 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Rose Murray, mailing date September 11, 2023, (pt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. (rbe)
Related: [-]
1 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16905510, filed by Noel Ricardo Stephens. Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Montanez, Felix)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit WDNY Record of Conviction,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice to Appear,
Att: 3 Exhibit Hearing Transcripts 2013-2014,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2019 IJ Decision,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2020 BIA Decision,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2021 Third Circuit Remand,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2022 BIA Remand,
Att: 8 Exhibit December 2022 Transcript,
Att: 9 Exhibit 2023 IJ Decision,
Att: 10 Exhibit 2023 BIA Brief,
Att: 11 Exhibit 2022 R&R and Order,
Att: 12 Exhibit Custody Hearing Submission,
Att: 13 Exhibit 2022 IJ Custody Order,
Att: 14 Exhibit Motion to Enforce Judgment,
Att: 15 Exhibit 2022 CRCL Complaint,
Att: 16 Exhibit Dr. Gharia Medical Visit,
Att: 17 Exhibit Dr. Gharia Profile,
Att: 18 Exhibit SPLC Email to ICE Leadership,
Att: 19 Exhibit Release Plan,
Att: 20 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet