California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:23-cv-04629
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:19 AM PST
Defendant
Chevron Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Michael Patrick Brown
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Virchus Ferguson Miller
Represented By
John J. Nelson
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info

GPO Oct 27 2023
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL 3083 CTO-7) TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Massachusetts by MDL Panel. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 27, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Transferring Case - - Out of District Fri 10/27 12:49 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL 3083 CTO-7) TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Massachusetts by MDL Panel. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 10/27 12:54 PM
Case electronically transferred to the District of Massachusetts. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 10/12 9:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virchus Ferguson Miller re10 Clerk's Notice. (Nelson, John) Modified on 10/12/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/11 8:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virchus Ferguson Miller. Chevron Federal Credit Union served on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. (Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 10/09 1:43 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Chevron Federal Credit Union. (Brown, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 09/26 10:08 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/26 8:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/26/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 Summons Issued as to Chevron Federal Credit Union. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 EXHIBITS re1 Complaint Exhibit A filed byVirchus Ferguson Miller. Related [+] (Nelson, John)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Chevron Federal Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18628835.). Filed byVirchus Ferguson Miller.(Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer is reminded to include a caption page in future filings if the exhibits are to be filed separately on the docket. Re:3 Exhibits filed by Virchus Ferguson Miller. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]