California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 5:23-cv-04630
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Nokes & Quinn Apc
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Angela M. Taylor
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Charlotte A. Long
Trans Union, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ling Chen
Represented By
Trinette Gragirena Kent
Lemberg Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/26 2:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2024 11:00 AM in before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/25 10:20 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. .(bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 09/25 9:49 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/25 9:31 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ling Chen.. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/20 10:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ling Chen. Trans Union LLC served on 9/15/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/20 10:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ling Chen. Experian Information Solutions Inc. served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/20 10:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ling Chen. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 9/15/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 12:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 12:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 12:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/12 12:21 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 9:16 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 8:19 AM
Proposed Summons. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 8:17 AM
Proposed Summons. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 8:16 AM
Proposed Summons. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 8:13 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18629006.). Filed byLing Chen.(Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet