Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Referred: Robert A Richardson
Case #: 3:23-cv-01191
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Nov 30, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 3:20 AM EST
Defendant
T&T Medical Corp.
Defendant
Charley Thurber
Defendant
Kia Thurber
Plaintiff
ZetrOZ Systems, LLC
Represented By
James Emory Regan
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/18 9:47 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time until April 29, 2024, to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/18/2024. (Friedle, H)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/17 1:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2024 Nunc Pro Tunc to File Stipulation of Dismissal by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
Friday, March 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/01 9:49 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time until March 29, 2024 to File Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/1/2024. (Friedle, H)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/28 3:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 29, 2024 to File Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
Thursday, January 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/18 10:14 AM
ORDER granting22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2024 to file the Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/18/2024. (Friedle, H.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/12 2:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2024 to file the Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
Monday, December 04, 2023
21 21 1 pgs utility Report on Patent/Trademark Form Mon 12/04 9:37 AM
AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Att: 1 Notice of Settlement (Doc. 19)
Thursday, November 30, 2023
order Order Thu 11/30 1:25 PM
ORDER. This case has been reportedly settled. Rather than keeping it open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening within 45 days of this order. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the court or simply for inclusion in the court's file), they may do so within 45 days of this order. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/30/2023. (Friedle, H.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 12/01 1:56 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 11/22 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/25 1:57 PM
ORDER granting17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/25/2023. (Friedle, H.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 10/25 2:13 PM
Answer deadline updated for T&T Medical Corp. to 11/24/2023; Charley Thurber and Kia Thurber to 11/29/2023. (Friedle, H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/24 4:25 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/11 3:27 PM
ORDER granting15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/25/2023 for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/11/2023. (Friedle, H.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 10/12 10:38 AM
Answer deadline updated for T&T Medical Corp. to 10/25/2023; Charley Thurber and Kia Thurber to 10/30/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/10 4:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/25/2023 for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 Complaint by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/10 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Kia Thurber served on 9/25/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/10 4:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Charley Thurber served on 9/25/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
Thursday, September 28, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/28 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. T&T Medical Corp. served on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 09/12 10:14 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kia Thurber* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Emory Regan* *McCarter & English, LLP, CityPlace 1* *185 Asylum Street, 36th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 09/12 10:13 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Charley Thurber* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Emory Regan* *McCarter & English, LLP, CityPlace 1* *185 Asylum Street, 36th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 09/12 10:08 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *T&T Medical Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Emory Regan* *McCarter & English, LLP, CityPlace 1* *185 Asylum Street, 36th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 09/12 10:07 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,7 Report on Patent/Trademark Form,6 Protective Order,1 Complaint filed by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC,2 Disclosure Statement filed by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC,5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs utility Report on Patent/Trademark Form Tue 09/12 10:05 AM
AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of the Complaint
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 order Protective Order Tue 09/12 10:03 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/11/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 09/12 10:02 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/11/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 09/12 10:01 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2023 Discovery due by 3/12/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2024 Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2023. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 09/11 1:08 PM
Disclosure Statement by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7477347.), filed by ZetrOZ Systems, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
service Request to Issue Summons Mon 09/11 12:51 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to T&T Medical Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
service Request to Issue Summons Mon 09/11 12:53 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Charley Thurber. Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
service Request to Issue Summons Mon 09/11 12:54 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Kia Thurber (Kindell). Related [+]
Related: [-] gan, James
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/11 4:22 PM
Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 09/11 3:35 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]