California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:23-cv-04632
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Dec 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Emilia M. Bardini
Director of the USCIS San Francisco Asylum Office San Francisco Asylum Office 75 Hawthorne Street Seventh Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105
Defendant
UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff
EBRU ATES AKBABA
7241 Briza Loop
San Ramon, CA 94582
Represented By
Dorukhan Korkut Oguz
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/13 5:48 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by EBRU ATES AKBABA (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 12/04 12:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EBRU ATES AKBABA (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 11/30 1:51 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect case number on filing. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 10 Certificate of Service filed by EBRU ATES AKBABA (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 11/29 2:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EBRU ATES AKBABA (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/17 9:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by EBRU ATES AKBABA.. (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/04 11:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 09/13 10:29 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 09/12 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Emilia M. Bardini, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 2:06 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/12 1:36 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by EBRU ATES AKBABA . (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dorukhan Korkut Oguz (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 1:14 PM
Proposed Summons. (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 1:04 PM
COMPLAINT 3:23-cv-04632 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18631070.). Filed byEBRU ATES AKBABA.(Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/11 2:40 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 Related [+]. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Please complete correct Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re:1 Complaint filed by EBRU ATES AKBABA (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] v. 10/20