California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04633
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Case in other court:Sonoma County Superior Court, SCV-272825
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Gordon Rees Scully & Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Trina Marie Clayton
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Duffy
Represented By
Tionna Carvalho
Strategic Legal Practices, Apc
contact info
Christopher James Campbell
Strategic Legal Practices, Apc
contact info
Mark Gibson
Strategic Legal Practices
contact info
Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Strategic Legal Practices, Apc
contact info
Tionna Grace Dolin
Strategic Legal Practices, Apc
contact info
Spencer Peter Hugret
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 12/24 1:40 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint Submission) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Hugret, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 12/23 9:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Rabiya F. Tirmizi on behalf of Ryan Duffy (Tirmizi, Rabiya)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/04 10:48 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 30 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 10/31 1:57 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER filed by Ryan Duffy.(Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
29 29 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/02 12:03 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 28 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
28 28 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 10/01 1:50 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE JURISDICTION filed by Ryan Duffy.(Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION
Thursday, August 08, 2024
27 27 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 08/08 10:04 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE JURISDICTION by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 26 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
26 26 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 08/07 6:47 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Duffy.(Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
25 25 order Judgment Wed 07/24 9:24 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/24/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Change In Counsel Fri 06/14 9:17 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Tionna Carvalho Notice Of Disassociation Of Counsel For Plaintiffs (Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Tue 06/11 11:56 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Ryan Duffy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
22 22 motion Enforce Judgment Mon 03/18 12:47 PM
MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Ryan Duffy. Responses due by 4/15/2024. Replies due by 4/22/2024.(Carvalho, Tionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 03/12 10:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING set for March 15, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. A Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 03/11 10:04 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:19 Case Management Statement filed by Ryan Duffy (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
20 20 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Fri 03/08 11:24 AM
Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Joint Request to Appear Remoely at 3/15/2024 CMC filed by Ryan Duffy. Responses due by 3/12/2024.(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Re Joint Request to Appear Remotely
19 19 misc Case Management Statement Fri 03/08 11:09 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Ryan Duffy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
18 18 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 12/01 12:46 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for December 8, 2023 is vacated. Case referred to private mediation. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2024. Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2024. Discovery due by 10/18/2024. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/1/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Fri 12/01 12:47 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private Mediation. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
17 17 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 11/30 2:33 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Initial) filed by Ryan Duffy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
16 16 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 11/22 1:18 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/21 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/21 12:29 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Vilchez, Katherine)
Related: [-]
13 13 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Tue 11/21 8:19 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/12 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Campbell (Campbell, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 09/14 8:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/13 11:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/13/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 09/12 11:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/12 7:37 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/11 12:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company..(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 11:36 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Pollard Vilchez(Vilchez, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Marie Clayton(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/11 11:27 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan), Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates for Ford Motor Company.(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 09/11 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV-272825. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18629747). Filed byFord Motor Company.(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal,
Att: 2 52 pgs Exhibit A to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 8 Exhibit G to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 9 Exhibit H to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 10 Exhibit I to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 11 Exhibit J to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 12 Exhibit K to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 13 Exhibit L to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 14 Exhibit M to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 15 Exhibit N to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 16 Exhibit O to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 17 Exhibit P to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 19 Exhibit R to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 20 Exhibit S to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 21 Exhibit T to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 22 Exhibit U to Atty Decl iso Removal,
Att: 23 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 24 Certificate/Proof of Service