California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:23-mc-80226
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Sep 14, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 14, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/14 8:54 AM
Case has been assigned Civil C23-4651AGT. Please file an application for refund for the payment for the Misc case 3-23-mc-80226 that was filed.[LINK:Electronic filing error] . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: Electronic Filing Error,, (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Other Miscellaneous Matter Mon 09/11 10:44 AM
MISCELLANEOUS MATTER: Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-18629949.). Filed by Life Line Screening of America.(Liu, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Interested Parites,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/11 12:02 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Case incorrectly opened as a miscellaneous case. Please re-file case as a civil case and pay the $402 filing fee. You may file for a refund for the $49 misc case filing fee, forms and instructions are found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Other Miscellaneous Matter, filed by Life Line Screening of America (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]