California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:23-cv-04631
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Jul 10, 2024
Defendant
Kilolo Kijakazi
Defendant
SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Plaintiff
Shauna Jaleyne Deal

GPO Jul 10 2024
ORDER REVERSING Administrative Law Judge Decision in Part and REMANDING for Further Proceedings. Re: ECF 1, 7, 11, 12. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/10/2024. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 08/16 1:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation Awarding Equal Access To Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) And Costs Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1920. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 08/15 2:29 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For The Award And Payment Of Attorney Fees And Expenses Pursuant To The Equal Access To Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(D) And Costs Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1920 and costs in the amount of $402.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation filed by Shauna Jaleyne Deal.(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 order Judgment Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/10 12:01 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Claimant. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/10/2024. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 8 pgs order Order Remanding Case Wed 07/10 11:50 AM
ORDER REVERSING Administrative Law Judge Decision in Part and REMANDING for Further Proceedings. Re: ECF 1 , 7 , 11 , 12 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/10/2024. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Mon 03/25 3:13 PM
RESPONSE re7 Brief in support of Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Shauna Jaleyne Deal. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
11 11 oth_sup Brief Mon 03/11 9:45 AM
Brief Commissioner's Brief filed byKilolo Kijakazi. (Chandler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
10 10 order Order on Stipulation Tue 01/02 10:20 AM
Order granting 9 Stipulation (extending time for defendant to file motion to 3/12/2024) entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 01/02 6:46 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME filed by Kilolo Kijakazi, Shauna Jaleyne Deal. (Chandler, Thomas) Modified on 1/2/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 12/19 5:47 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Thomas E. Chandler Terminating Erin Highland (Chandler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
7 7 oth_sup Brief Wed 12/13 11:14 AM
Brief / Opening Brief filed byShauna Jaleyne Deal. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
6 6 misc SSA Administrative Transcript Mon 11/13 9:37 AM
Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Certified Administrative Record in Electronic Form by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Lo, Michelle) Modified on 11/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1,
Att: 2 Part 2,
Att: 3 Part 3,
Att: 4 Part 4,
Att: 5 Part 5,
Att: 6 Part 6,
Att: 7 Part 7,
Att: 8 Part 8
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/12 5:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Highland, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 order Social Security Procedural Order Tue 09/12 12:41 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/12 12:01 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shauna Jaleyne Deal.. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 10:30 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 8:57 AM
COMPLAINT For Review Of Final Decision Of The Commissioner Of Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18629152.). Filed byShauna Jaleyne Deal.(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet