California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 4:23-cv-04629
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Chevron Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Michael Patrick Brown
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Virchus Ferguson Miller
Represented By
John J. Nelson
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 09/25 5:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/25 1:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Virchus Ferguson Miller.. (Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 10:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Chevron Federal Credit Union. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/11 10:08 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 9:10 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_sup Exhibits Mon 09/11 6:53 AM
EXHIBITS re1 Complaint Exhibit A filed byVirchus Ferguson Miller. Related [+] (Nelson, John)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 6:50 AM
Proposed Summons. (Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 6:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Chevron Federal Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18628835.). Filed byVirchus Ferguson Miller.(Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/11 10:14 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer is reminded to include a caption page in future filings if the exhibits are to be filed separately on the docket. Re:3 Exhibits filed by Virchus Ferguson Miller. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]