Maine District Court
Judge:John A Woodcock, Jr
Referred: Karen Frink Wolf
Case #: 2:23-cv-00339
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 5:19 AM EST
Defendant
JANET COIT
In her official capacity as Assistant Administrator for Fisheries at NMFS 1315 EAST-WEST HIGHWAY 14TH FLOOR
SILVER SPRING, MD 20910
Represented By
FREDERICK H. TURNER
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
JOHN G. OSBORN
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
1315 EAST-WEST HIGHWAY 14TH FLOOR
SILVER SPRING, MD 20910
Represented By
FREDERICK H. TURNER
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
JOHN G. OSBORN
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
GINA RAIMONDO
In her official capacity as Secretary of Commerce US SECRETARY OF COMMERCE 1401 CONSTITUTION AVE NW
WASHINGTON, DC 20230
Represented By
FREDERICK H. TURNER
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
JOHN G. OSBORN
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
SAMUEL D RAUCH , III
SILVER SPRING, MD 20910
Represented By
FREDERICK H. TURNER
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
JOHN G. OSBORN
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
NEW ENGLAND FISHERMEN'S STEWARDSHIP ASSOCIATION
Represented By
JOHN HENRY THOMPSON
Jones Day
contact info
MEGAN SOWARDS NEWTON
Jones Day
contact info
ALEXIS ZHANG
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
BRETT SHUMATE
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
LOUIS JOSEPH CAPOZZI, III
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
JAMES BURNHAM
King Street Legal PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
JERRY LEEMAN
Terminated: 09/22/2023
14 OLD TOWN ROAD
ORRS ISLAND, ME 04066
Represented By
JOHN HENRY THOMPSON
Jones Day
contact info
MEGAN SOWARDS NEWTON
Jones Day
contact info
ALEXIS ZHANG
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
BRETT SHUMATE
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
LOUIS JOSEPH CAPOZZI, III
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
JAMES BURNHAM
King Street Legal PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 30 2025
ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
73 73 misc Transcript Thu 03/13 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Oral Argument held on October 29, 2024, before Judge John A. Woodcock, Jr. Court of Appeals Docket Number 25-1213 Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lori Dunbar, Telephone Number: (207) 749-4072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025. (DUNBAR, LORI)
Related: [-]