California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:23-cv-04640
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Re-opened:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Case in other court:San Mateo County Superior Court, 23CIV03523
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Michelle Myer
Represented By
David Benjamin Witkin
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Christopher S. Alvarez
Fisher Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By
David Benjamin Witkin
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Christopher S. Alvarez
Fisher Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Don Watson
Represented By
David Benjamin Witkin
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Christopher S. Alvarez
Fisher Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario Elena Anicama
2700 W Sunrise Lakes Dr Apt 210
Sunrise, FL 33322

GPO Oct 24 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/31/2023. The Court hereby VACATES the Motion to Dismiss Hearing on 12/21/2023. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/2023. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Dec 04 2023
*VACATED by Minute Order 27* ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 2/26/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jul 15 2024
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 43 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. (emclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
67 67 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 03/13 2:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Status Conference held on 2/25/2025. Total Time in Court: 14 Minutes. Court Reporter: Teri Veres. Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2025. Status Conference set for 7/15/2025, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL PARTIES PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PM. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2025)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
66 66 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 02/21 1:59 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Motion Hearing. The Court HEREBY VACATES 65 Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2025. Docket Number 65 was incorrectly filed, discovery requests are not motions and should not be filed on the docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
65 65 motion Produce Wed 02/19 8:02 PM
First MOTION to Produce Documents filed by Mario Elena Anicama. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2025 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 3/20/2025. Replies due by 4/21/2025.(Anicama, Mario)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Cert of Service
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
64 64 misc Status Report Tue 02/18 9:19 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Witkin, David)
Related: [-]