California Northern District Court
Judge:Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:23-cv-04642
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Jan 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Twitter Inc.
Represented By
James Jonathan Hawk
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Defendant
X Corp.
Represented By
James Jonathan Hawk
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Plaintiff
Cresa Global Inc.
Represented By
Ethan Isaac Jacobs
Ethan Jacobs Law Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 01/03 10:15 AM
[TEXT ONLY NOTICE] The Court has received the Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), along with a proposed Order. Dkt. 22 . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), a Stipulation of Dismissal is self-effectuating without the need for Court approval or Order. Accordingly, the Court need not sign the proposed dismissal Order. The case is deemed dismissed with prejudice by action of the Parties' Stipulation. The Clerk is directed to close this action, accordingly. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 31, 2023
22 22 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Sun 12/31 8:56 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Cresa Global Inc..(Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 18, 2023
21 21 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 12/18 2:16 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2023. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/12/2024. Joint Pretrial Statement due by 10/4/2024. Discovery due by 2/2/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2024. Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on 12/18/23. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
20 20 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Thu 12/14 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2023. Order to issue. If the case doesn't settle by 12/29/2023, initial discovery is due no later than Friday, 2/2/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 02/08/2024 at 2:30PM in Courtroom F, Floor 15 before Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang. Proposed ESI order and protective order due: 02/09/2024. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 04/12/2024 Dispositive Motions due: 6/28/2024 Hearing on Dispositive Motions: 08/09/2024 Joint Pretrial Statement due: 10/4/2024 Final Pretrial Conference at 10/18/2024 at 2:30pm. Trial: 11/18/24 at 08:30AM (2 days) Pleading Amendment deadline: 12/29/2023 Presumptive limits: 1 deposition per party 5 interrogatorys per party 30 requests for admissions per party 30 document requests per party No third party subpoenas permitted by Court No expert discovery permitted by Court Digital Recording Time Related [+]: 10:32-10:44 (12m). Plaintiff Attorney: Ethan Jacobs. Defendant Attorney: James Hawk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2023)
Related: [-] corded via Liberty
Thursday, December 07, 2023
19 19 misc Case Management Statement Thu 12/07 12:57 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cresa Global Inc.. (Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 12/07 12:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by X Corp. (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
17 17 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 11/30 11:00 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
16 16 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/16 2:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by X Corp... (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 11/09 11:59 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang granting 13 Motion to Substitute Attorney - change of law firm. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 11/09 8:26 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party was also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/24/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 11/08 5:36 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney J. Jonathan Hawk filed by X Corp.. (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 11/08 11:39 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file using the following event: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Motions - General > Substitute Attorney. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 11 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by X Corp. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/07 1:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by X Corp.. (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Change In Counsel Mon 11/06 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by James Jonathan Hawk (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 10/27 11:00 AM
STIPULATION Further Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Twitter Inc., X Corp.. (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
9 9 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/10 4:42 PM
STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Twitter Inc., X Corp.. (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/20 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cresa Global Inc.. X Corp. served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/13 9:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cresa Global Inc. (Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/12 11:17 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 11:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Twitter Inc., X Corp.. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/11 2:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cresa Global Inc... (Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 12:22 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 11:57 AM
Proposed Summons. (Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Twitter Inc., X Corp. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18630483.). Filed byCresa Global Inc..(Jacobs, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet