California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Referred: Pslc Sjt
Case #: 3:23-cv-04639
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Plaintiff
Eleazar Ambriz

GPO Nov 03 2023
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/3/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 11/3/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 23, 2024
16 16 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/28 10:30 AM
Mail sent to Eleazar Ambriz returned as undeliverable. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/14 3:46 PM
NOTICE by Eleazar Ambriz. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
14 14 misc Mail Returned Fri 12/08 3:28 PM
Returned as undeliverable re12 Order Dismissing Case,13 Judgment, (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
13 13 order Judgment Fri 11/03 3:25 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/3/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/03 3:23 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/3/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
11 11 misc Mail Returned Fri 11/03 10:56 AM
Mail sent to Eleazar Ambriz returned as undeliverable re8 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. Mail Returned; response required by 1/2/2024. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 11/02 1:44 PM
Mail sent to Eleazar Ambriz returned as undeliverable re9 Order Reassigning Case. Mail Returned; response required by 1/2/2024. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/17 9:03 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/23. (as, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Mon 10/16 11:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
7 7 misc Mail Returned Mon 09/25 3:53 PM
Mail sent to Eleazar Ambriz returned as undeliverable re4 Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form,5 Clerk's Notice re: IFP. Mail Returned; response required by 11/24/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 09/11 1:01 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Mon 09/11 1:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/19/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form Mon 09/11 12:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 10/19/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter Mon 09/11 12:49 PM
Letter re hearing request from Eleazar Ambriz.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
2 2 misc Letter Mon 09/11 12:48 PM
Letter 2 from Eleazar Ambriz.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 misc Letter Mon 09/11 12:47 PM
Letter from Eleazar Ambriz.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope