California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04643
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
1515 3rd Street
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
1515 3rd St.
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
K. O.
Represented By
Rachel Beth Abrams
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise
contact info

GPO Oct 23 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084-CRB. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 23, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 11:16 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by K. O.. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/24 10:21 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
utility MDL Member Case Tue 10/24 9:54 AM
MEMBER CASE MDL 3084: 3:23-cv-04643-VC O. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al pursuant to Order Relating Cases (Docket 26 in 3:23-md-03084-CRB) cc: JPMDL (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 10/23 7:47 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/23/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Mon 10/23 2:09 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084-CRB. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 23, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/03 3:40 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND RASIER, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colton Parks (Parks, Colton)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Quinn Schleier (Schleier, Samuel)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/28 12:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Augusto Alarcon (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Mon 09/25 2:41 PM
Notice of Related Actions Filed in MDL 3084 In re: Uber Technologies, Inc. Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation. (Rule 6.2(d) of the Rules of Procedure for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation). (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 09/25 9:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by K. O. re7 Summons Issued (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 09/14 2:15 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 2 Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously. (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 09/14 12:41 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, November 24, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 12:34 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/14/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 09/14 11:12 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/14/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 10:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/14/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by K. O. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously; Memorandum of Law in Support filed by K. O.. Responses due by 9/25/2023.(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18631066.). Filed byK. O..(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet