Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Mark G Mastroianni
Case #: 3:23-cv-30091
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
Jerome H. Anderson
70 South Street
Pittsfield, MA 01201
Represented By
Matthew J. Lynch
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Peter Marchetti
70 South Street
Pittsfield, MA 01201
Represented By
Matthew J. Lynch
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Harry Moore
70 South Street
Pittsfield, MA 01201
Represented By
Matthew J. Lynch
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Pittsfield Cooperative Bank
70 South Street
Pittsfield, MA 01201
Represented By
Matthew J. Lynch
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Victoria May
446 Main Street, Ste. 1503
Worcester, MA 01608
Represented By
Janet R. Ruggieri
Murphy & Rudolf, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
53 53 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/23 10:14 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting51 Parties Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Sixty (60) Days. The parties' proposed dates have been adopted and a trial date has been set. See attached Revised Scheduling ORDER for complete details. (TF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
52 52 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/23 10:08 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER : A hearing on any filed dispositive motions will be held on December 8, 2025 at 10:00 AM. If no dispositive motions are filed, the hearing will be converted into an initial pretrial conference. Jury Trial set for 4/20/2026 at 9:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom (In person only) before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni . See order for complete details on deadlines.(TF)
Related: [-]