Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Case #: 4:23-cv-00800
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Nov 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 2:29 AM CST
Defendant
HALSTED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Defendant
LVNV Funding, LLC
Plaintiff
Benjamin Coleman
Represented By
Shawn Jaffer
Jaffer & Associates PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, November 13, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/13 12:08 PM
Notice: Notice of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this civil case is dismissed with prejudice. The clerk will close and terminate this matter. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/09 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Coleman(Jaffer, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/01 10:08 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/1/2023. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 11:16 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to LVNV Funding, LLC. (jmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 11:15 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to HALSTED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9698042.), filed by Benjamin Coleman.(Jaffer, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/11 4:32 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (xl, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Mon 09/11 4:33 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (xl, )
Related: [-]