California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 5:23-cv-04649
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Nguyen Thi Thuong
Plaintiff
Kadokawa Corporation
Represented By
Junji Suzuki
Marshall Suzuki Law Group, Llp.
contact info
Tokiko Yasuda
Marshall Suzuki Law Group, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 11, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/11 4:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kadokawa Corporation (Suzuki, Junji)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 4:03 PM
Proposed Summons. (Suzuki, Junji)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Nguyen Thi Thuong ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18631954.). Filed byKADOKAWA CORPORATION.(Suzuki, Junji) Modified on 9/11/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet