California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:23-cv-04650
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Defendant
Tracy Renaud
Associate Director USCIS Service Center Operations 20 Massachusetts Ave., NW Washington DC
Washington, DC 20529
Plaintiff
Satvinder Singh
Represented By
Joseph John Siguenza
Law Offices Of Ashwani Bhakhri
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/15 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Satvinder Singh (Siguenza, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 09/13 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/12 2:26 PM
Proposed Summons. (Siguenza, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/12 2:24 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Satvinder Singh.. (Siguenza, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 09/12 10:38 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/11 2:29 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18631526.). Filed bySatvinder Singh.(Siguenza, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to 2,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet