California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Case #: 5:23-cv-04652
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
7 7 4 pgs order Order Wed 01/29 1:46 PM
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; DENYING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED ON APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS; AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/29/2025. (blflc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 01/29 8:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. This is a cv case on a 2255. Further filings shall be in its criminal case CR 19-00611 BLF-02 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 01/29 8:19 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Documents filed into Incorrect case. The correct case is 19-CR-00611-BLF, these will be Re-filed by the Clerk into that case. No further action is needed. Re: 3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Octavio Paque. Re: 4 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Octavio Paque (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 01/28 3:03 PM
USCA for the Ninth Circuit Case Number 25-559 for4 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Octavio Paque. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Mon 01/27 9:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Octavio Paque. Appeal of Order on Motion to Vacate,2 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). (Guzman, Erick)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/27 8:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Octavio Paque.(Guzman, Erick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Thu 01/16 7:07 PM
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT PAQUE'S § 2255 MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/16/2025. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
1 1 motion Vacate Tue 09/12 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION and Motion to Vacate Conviction [28 U.S.C. § 2255] filed by Octavio Paque.(cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration A