Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Charles Eskridge
Referred: Christina A Bryan
Case #: 4:23-cv-03397
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023
Case in other court:296th Judicial District Court of Harris County, 23-52976
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 3:49 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
Clark Hill PLC
Conflict Check Party
Daniel J. Olds
Defendant
Fluid-Flow Products, Inc.
2600 Dallas Parkway Suite 600
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Scott Allen Shanes
Strasburger Price LLP
contact info
Defendant
Generon IGS, Inc.
2600 Dallas Parkway Suite 600
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Scott Allen Shanes
Strasburger Price LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Weil Group Resources, LLC
700 Louisiana Street Suite 3400
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Brandon Francis Renken
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2024 11:37 AM CDT
Monday, September 11, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 296th Judicial District Harris County, TX, case number 2023-52976 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30495926) filed by Generon IGS, Inc., Fluid-Flow Products, Inc..(Shanes, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Fluid-Flow Products, Inc., Generon IGS, Inc., filed.(Shanes, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fluid-Flow Products, Inc., filed.(Shanes, Scott)
Related: [-]