California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:23-mc-80227
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 20, 2023
15 15 respm Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Fri 10/20 4:59 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Ball, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/17 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Drickey Jackson (Deckant, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/28 4:05 PM
ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen Granting 12 Consent Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on September 28, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/28 2:47 PM
Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motions to Compel Production of Documents filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 10/12/2023. Replies due by 10/19/2023.(Pujari, Davina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of George P. Varghese in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/26 8:44 AM
ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on September 26, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/26 8:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting 8 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on September 26, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/25 5:09 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18677121.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Varghese, George)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/25 5:04 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18677105.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Aiken, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/25 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Davina Pujari (Pujari, Davina)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 09/25 12:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re5 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Meta Platforms, Inc. Pursuant to a Subpoena Duces Tecum; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (Ball, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 motion Compel Fri 09/15 11:00 PM
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Meta Platforms, Inc. Pursuant to a Subpoena Duces Tecum; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. Responses due by 9/29/2023. Replies due by 10/6/2023.(Ball, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew G. Ball,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/15 10:15 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Drickey Jackson re1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening), (Deckant, Neal) Modified on 9/15/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/13 10:50 AM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 1 Applicant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on September 13, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 8:59 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening) Mon 09/11 4:02 PM
MOTION TO COMPEL Production of Documents against Meta Platforms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-18632273.). Filed by Drickey Jackson.(Deckant, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Neal J. Deckant,
Att: 2 Proposed Order