California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 5:23-cv-04655
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:24 AM PST
Defendant
Heading Health Inc.
Represented By
Vincent Joseph Adams
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Simon Tankel
Represented By
Vincent Joseph Adams
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Goozh
Represented By
Eric Akira Tate
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Cooper Joseph Spinelli
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Travis Manning Adams
Macias Rodriguez Adams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 10/26 11:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/26 4:01 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Goozh.. (Spinelli, Cooper)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10/12 8:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 11:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Heading Health Inc., Simon Tankel. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 9:05 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/11 6:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Goozh (Tate, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 6:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Tate, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages against Heading Health Inc., Simon Tankel ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18632768.). Filed byRichard Goozh.(Tate, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet