District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amir H Ali
Case #: 1:23-cv-02660
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1605A Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 3:23 AM EST
Defendant
BANK MELLI IRAN
Defendant
BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN
Defendant
THE ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS
Defendant
NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY
Defendant
ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
I THE MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS IMAM KHOMEINI AVE UNITED NATIONS ST
TEHRAN, AZ 85232
Defendant
IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY
Plaintiff
BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, III
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES BURTON
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
WALTER LEMAN THOMAS
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
BRANDON MACK WARE
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANTELL WARE
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
SHERRY WARE
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
BLAKE WIESE
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
B. R. B.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
G. W. B.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH SANTOLLA
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN LEE BLEHM, JR.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN LEE BLEHM, SR.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF BALTAZAR MORIN, JR.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF ISMAEL GALVAN SOLORIO
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS CARL GREGORY, III
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
A. M.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID WESLEY TANNER, JR.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
J. E. W.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
S. W.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
P. Z.
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES DAVID BLEHM
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
SAM KALLABAT
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN DANIEL FIFER
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
KELLI FIFER
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK BURTON
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFERY BURTON
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA JOHNSON
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
FADIA KALLABAT
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
DONALD ALAN ELLIFF
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
ROCHELLE LANG
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY LARRY
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
HEWA AHMED MAMAND
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT KENT MASON
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
FRED MCTEAR
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE BURTON
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
KYLE JAMES PAULUS
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
SEAN TANNER PHAM
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA
Represented By
Christopher Gus Paulos
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 1 pgs misc Clerks Entry of Default Tue 02/18 8:19 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY (mg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
22 22 1 pgs misc Affidavit for Default Sat 02/15 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by Defendants Islamic Republic of Iran, Iranian Ministry of Intelligence & Security & The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corpos by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
21 21 5 pgs order Standing Order Wed 02/05 2:51 PM
STANDING ORDER. The parties are ordered to comply with the directives set forth in the attached standing order. See document for details. This order supersedes any prior standing order applicable to this case and governs this case going forward. The parties need not refile any previously filed pleading or document with the Court based on the issuance of this standing order. Signed by Judge Amir H. Ali on 2/5/2025. (lcaha2)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
20 20 21 pgs service Summons Returned Executed as to Foreign State or Agency Wed 01/29 2:00 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY served on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025; ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN served on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025; ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS served on 12/2/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/27 10:20 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Amir H. Ali. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
19 19 1 pgs misc Certificate of Clerk -1608(a)(4) Mon 09/23 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK dispatching two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 9/23/2024, by FED EX to the U. S. Department of State, Director of Overseas Citizens Services, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waybill
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 misc Request -1608(a)(4) Mon 09/23 10:13 AM
REQUEST from ALL PLAINTIFFS for the Clerk to dispatch for mailing two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, FED EX, to the U. S. Department of State, Director of Overseas Citizens Services, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (See docket entry17 to view documents) (zdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
17 17 misc Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing Tue 09/17 6:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING Under 28 USC 1608(a)(4) by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Clerk Request for Service Under 28 USC 1608(a)(4)
16 16 4 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/17 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Failed Service Under 28 U.S.C 1608(a)(3) by ALL PLAINTIFFS(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Tracking service Islamic Rep. of Iran,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B Tracking service IRGC,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C Tracking service MOIS
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
15 15 1 pgs misc Certificate of Clerk -1608(b)(3)(B) - regist Tue 07/16 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK dispatching one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 7/16/2024, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). (zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waybill
14 14 misc Certificate of Clerk -1608(a)(3) -regist Tue 07/16 3:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK dispatching one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 7/16/2024, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waybill
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
13 13 misc Request - 1608(b)(3)(B) - register Wed 07/10 9:07 AM
REQUEST from All Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). (See docket entry11 to view document) (zdp)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Request-1608(a)(3) - register Wed 07/10 8:59 AM
REQUEST from ALL PLAINTIFFS for the Clerk to dispatch for mailing one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (See docket entry10 to view document) (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 misc Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing Mon 07/01 6:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING on Defendant Bank Markazi & 2 others via USPS by ANTHONY ANDREW, B. R. B., G. W. B., BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, III, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, JOHN LEE BLEHM, JR., JOHN LEE BLEHM, SR., KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, CHARLES BURTON, JANE BURTON, JEFFERY BURTON, PATRICK BURTON, JEREMY CAMPOS, ROSALVA CAMPOS, BORYANA TOVEVA CELE, MCKAYLA RICHELLE DRUMMOND, ROSWITHA MANUELA ECKERT, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, ESTATE OF BALTAZAR MORIN, JR., ESTATE OF ISMAEL GALVAN SOLORIO, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, KELLI FIFER, ADRIANA FUENTES, GERARDO FUENTES, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, III, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, MARIA JOHNSON, FADIA KALLABAT, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, SAM KALLABAT, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, ROCHELLE LANG, ANTHONY LARRY, JOAQUIN CAMPOS LUQUIN, JR, A. M., HEWA AHMED MAMAND, ROBERT KENT MASON, FRED MCTEAR, BROOKLYN NICOLE, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, STRAUSS JOEY PETRO, SEAN TANNER PHAM, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, TAE SUK SPARKS, CHELSEY ELIZABETH STORMS, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, JR., WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, J. E. W., S. W., BRANDON MACK WARE, SHANTELL WARE, SHERRY WARE, BLAKE WIESE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, P. Z..(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Clerk Re: Service via USPS (Bank Markazi & 2 others)
10 10 misc Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing Mon 07/01 5:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING on Defendant Iran via USPS by ANTHONY ANDREW, B. R. B., G. W. B., BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, III, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, JOHN LEE BLEHM, JR., JOHN LEE BLEHM, SR., KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, CHARLES BURTON, JANE BURTON, JEFFERY BURTON, PATRICK BURTON, JEREMY CAMPOS, ROSALVA CAMPOS, BORYANA TOVEVA CELE, MCKAYLA RICHELLE DRUMMOND, ROSWITHA MANUELA ECKERT, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, ESTATE OF BALTAZAR MORIN, JR., ESTATE OF ISMAEL GALVAN SOLORIO, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, KELLI FIFER, ADRIANA FUENTES, GERARDO FUENTES, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, III, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, MARIA JOHNSON, FADIA KALLABAT, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, SAM KALLABAT, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, ROCHELLE LANG, ANTHONY LARRY, JOAQUIN CAMPOS LUQUIN, JR, A. M., HEWA AHMED MAMAND, ROBERT KENT MASON, FRED MCTEAR, BROOKLYN NICOLE, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, STRAUSS JOEY PETRO, SEAN TANNER PHAM, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, TAE SUK SPARKS, CHELSEY ELIZABETH STORMS, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, JR., WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, J. E. W., S. W., BRANDON MACK WARE, SHANTELL WARE, SHERRY WARE, BLAKE WIESE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, P. Z..(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Clerk Re: Service on Iran via USPS
Thursday, March 21, 2024
9 9 misc Sealed Document Thu 03/21 4:53 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by B. R. B., G. W. B., BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, III, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, JOHN LEE BLEHM, JR., JOHN LEE BLEHM, SR., KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, CHARLES BURTON, JANE BURTON, JEFFERY BURTON, PATRICK BURTON, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, ESTATE OF BALTAZAR MORIN, JR., ESTATE OF ISMAEL GALVAN SOLORIO, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, KELLI FIFER, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, III, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, MARIA JOHNSON, FADIA KALLABAT, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, SAM KALLABAT, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, ROCHELLE LANG, ANTHONY LARRY, A. M., HEWA AHMED MAMAND, ROBERT KENT MASON, FRED MCTEAR, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, SEAN TANNER PHAM, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, JR., WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, J. E. W., S. W., BRANDON MACK WARE, SHANTELL WARE, SHERRY WARE, BLAKE WIESE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, P. Z. re Order on Motion for Leave to File,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/21 4:49 PM
NOTICE Blackline Comparison to 1st Amended Complaint pursuant to Standing Order by B. R. B., G. W. B., BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, III, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, JOHN LEE BLEHM, JR., JOHN LEE BLEHM, SR., KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, CHARLES BURTON, JANE BURTON, JEFFERY BURTON, PATRICK BURTON, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, ESTATE OF BALTAZAR MORIN, JR., ESTATE OF ISMAEL GALVAN SOLORIO, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, KELLI FIFER, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, III, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, MARIA JOHNSON, FADIA KALLABAT, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, SAM KALLABAT, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, ROCHELLE LANG, ANTHONY LARRY, A. M., HEWA AHMED MAMAND, ROBERT KENT MASON, FRED MCTEAR, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, SEAN TANNER PHAM, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, JR., WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, J. E. W., S. W., BRANDON MACK WARE, SHANTELL WARE, SHERRY WARE, BLAKE WIESE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, P. Z. re5 Order (Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/21 4:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SEAN TANNER PHAM, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, SHERRY WARE, S. W., IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, SAM KALLABAT, ESTATE OF ISMAEL GALVAN SOLORIO, FADIA KALLABAT, PATRICK BURTON, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, III, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, BLAKE WIESE, JEFFERY BURTON, CHARLES BURTON, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, A. M., CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, J. E. W., KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, III, ESTATE OF BALTAZAR MORIN, JR., WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, JOHN LEE BLEHM, SR., ROBERT KENT MASON, KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, G. W. B., JANE BURTON, SHANTELL WARE, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, P. Z., HEWA AHMED MAMAND, MARIA JOHNSON, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, ROCHELLE LANG, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, FRED MCTEAR, ANTHONY LARRY, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, JR., KELLI FIFER, JOHN LEE BLEHM, JR., NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, BRANDON MACK WARE.(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 misc Sealed Document Mon 10/16 2:39 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by B. R. B., G. W. B., BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, III, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, JOHN LEE BLEHM, JR., JOHN LEE BLEHM, SR., KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, CHARLES BURTON, JANE BURTON, JEFFERY BURTON, PATRICK BURTON, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, ESTATE OF BALTAZAR MORIN, JR., ESTATE OF ISMAEL GALVAN SOLORIO, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, KELLI FIFER, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, III, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, MARIA JOHNSON, FADIA KALLABAT, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, SAM KALLABAT, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, ROCHELLE LANG, ANTHONY LARRY, A. M., HEWA AHMED MAMAND, ROBERT KENT MASON, FRED MCTEAR, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, SEAN TANNER PHAM, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, JR., WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, J. E. W., S. W., BRANDON MACK WARE, SHANTELL WARE, SHERRY WARE, BLAKE WIESE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, P. Z. re Order on Motion for Leave to File,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 10/13 10:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiffs'2 Motion for Leave to File Addresses Under Seal, the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs appearing in the1 Complaint shall file under seal, a list containing the names and residential interests of all Plaintiffs within three days of the date of this Order. It is further ORDERED that for future amendments to the complaint, Plaintiffs shall file, under seal, a list containing the names and residential addresses of all Plaintiffs within thirty days after filing. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 13, 2023. (lccjn2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 order Standing Order Thu 10/12 1:31 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 11, 2023. (lccjn2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 12 pgs service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 09/13 10:53 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants.(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/13 10:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 misc Errata Tue 09/12 1:01 PM
ERRATA by G W B, BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, JOHN LEE BLEHM(SR), JOHN LEE BLEHM(JR), KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, CHARLES BURTON, JANE BURTON, JEFFERY BURTON, PATRICK BURTON, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, KELLI FIFER, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, MARIA JOHNSON, FADIA KALLABAT, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, SAM KALLABAT, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, ROCHELLE LANG, ANTHONY LARRY, A M, HEWA AHMED MAMAND, ROBERT KENT MASON, FRED MCTEAR, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, SEAN TANNER PHAM, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, J E W, S W, BRANDON MACK WARE, SHANTELL WARE, SHERRY WARE, BLAKE WIESE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, P Z, ismael galvan solorio re2 Motion for Order,,,,.(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Motion for Leave to File Addresses Under Seal,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, September 11, 2023
2 2 motion Motion For Order Mon 09/11 10:04 PM
MOTION for Order for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by B R B, G W B, BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, JOHN LEE BLEHM(SR), JOHN LEE BLEHM(JR), KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, CHARLES BURTON, JANE BURTON, JEFFERY BURTON, PATRICK BURTON, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, KELLI FIFER, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, MARIA JOHNSON, FADIA KALLABAT, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, SAM KALLABAT, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, ROCHELLE LANG, ANTHONY LARRY, A M, HEWA AHMED MAMAND, ROBERT KENT MASON, FRED MCTEAR, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, SEAN TANNER PHAM, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, J E W, S W, BRANDON MACK WARE, SHANTELL WARE, SHERRY WARE, BLAKE WIESE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, P Z, ismael galvan solorio.(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 394 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 9:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10342594) filed by JOSEPH SANTOLLA, SEAN TANNER PHAM, URSULA MARIAM KALLABAT, SHERRY WARE, S W, IRIS ZENIA SOLORIO, SAM KALLABAT, ismael galvan solorio, FADIA KALLABAT, PATRICK BURTON, THOMAS CARL GREGORY, BRIAN DANIEL FIFER, BLAKE WIESE, JEFFERY BURTON, CHARLES BURTON, MACKENZIE ALAN ELLIFF, CHRISTOPHER GEORGE PAULUS, KEVIN THOMAS KALLABAT, A M, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WIESE, J E W, KEVIN GUERRA GARCIA, SARAH MALISSA SANTOLLA, BRADLEY FORREST BIBBINS, WALTER LEMAN THOMAS, JOHN LEE BLEHM(SR), ROBERT KENT MASON, KENNETH DEWAYNE BOYER, G W B, JANE BURTON, SHANTELL WARE, JOSEPH LOUIS HEREFORD, DONALD ALAN ELLIFF, P Z, HEWA AHMED MAMAND, MARIA JOHNSON, JAMES DAVID BLEHM, B R B, KYLE JAMES PAULUS, ROCHELLE LANG, HARRISON KEENAN ELLIFF, FRED MCTEAR, ANTHONY LARRY, JEANNETTA ROSE SANTOLLA, DAVID WESLEY TANNER, KELLI FIFER, JOHN LEE BLEHM(JR), NICHOLAS SAM KALLABAT, BRANDON MACK WARE.(Paulos, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN,
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons ISLMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS,
Att: 4 Summons IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY,
Att: 5 Summons BANK MARKAZI,
Att: 6 Summons BANK MELLI,
Att: 7 Summons NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY