Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 2:23-cv-01900
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 1:20 AM MST
Defendant
GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020
Represented By
Joshua C Black
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Timothy F Rosini
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Defendant
Good Works Auto Repair LLC
Represented By
Joshua C Black
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Timothy F Rosini
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Defendant
Glen Haywood
Represented By
Joshua C Black
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Timothy F Rosini
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Defendant
RaeAnn Haywood
Represented By
Joshua C Black
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Timothy F Rosini
Law Office Of Joshua Black PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dominic Driver
Represented By
Gregory A Owens
Florin Gray Bouzas Owens LLC
contact info
Christopher Robert Houk
Houk Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Wolfgang M Florin
Florin Gray Bouzas Owens LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Terminated: 12/27/2023

GPO May 08 2024
ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim 11 is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. It is granted as to Count IVWrongful Termination. It is denied in all other respects. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/2024. (KLG)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, May 12, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 11:42 AM
ORDER that the parties shall comply with the Court's July 12, 2024 Case Management Order as set forth above on or before May 19, 2025. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior District Judge G Murray Snow on 5/12/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 09/05 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Dominic Driver. (Houk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 07/31 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood. (Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
35 35 order Scheduling Order Fri 07/12 3:45 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 5/23/2025. Dispositive motions due by 6/27/2025. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/12/2024. (KLG)
Related: [-]
34 34 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Fri 07/12 11:52 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/12/2024. Deadlines discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Christopher Houk for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Timothy Rosini for Defendant. (Court Reporter Teri Veres.) Hearing held 11:33 AM to 11:37 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NSH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 07/09 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood. (Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
32 32 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Fri 07/05 8:18 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood. (Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 07/03 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Dominic Driver. (Houk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Thu 06/13 6:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Christopher Robert Houk. (Houk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
29 29 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/21 8:37 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for July 12, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 21 days before the Case Management Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(1). At this meeting the parties shall develop a joint Case Management Report...The parties shall jointly file the Case Management Report with the Clerk not less than seven (7) days before the Case Management Conference. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/20/2024. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 5:39 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood.(Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
27 27 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/08 8:39 AM
ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim11 is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. It is granted as to Count IVWrongful Termination. It is denied in all other respects. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/2024. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
26 26 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/03 12:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood, Unknown Parties. (Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/03 10:27 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2024 Re:11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, RaeAnn Haywood, Glen Haywood, Good Works Auto Repair LLC. Argument presented. IT IS ORDERED taking the motion under advisement. APPEARANCES: Christopher Houk for Plaintiff. Timothy Rosini for Defendants (Court Reporter Teri Veres.) Hearing held 10:04 AM to 10:21 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Thu 05/02 4:12 PM
ORDER denying the Accelerated Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset May 3, 2024 hearing (Doc.22 ). FURTHER ORDERED affirming the May 3, 2024 Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc.11 ). Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 5/2/24. (NKS)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/02 4:10 PM
ORDER - In advance of the oral argument on 5/3/24, the Court wishes to provide the parties with its tentative ruling. Simultaneous with the filing of this Order, counsel shall receive an email attaching the tentative ruling. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 5/2/24. (NKS)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Vacate Thu 05/02 1:39 PM
First MOTION to Vacate and reset May 3, 2024 hearing (Unopposed) by Dominic Driver.(Houk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
21 21 minutes ~Util - Set Motion Hearing Order Thu 03/07 8:31 AM
ORDER setting this matter for oral argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim11 for May 3, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Each party shall have 15 minutes to argue their position. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/6/2024. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
20 20 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Wed 12/27 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to5 Order, Unknown Parties (named as john and jane does I-V, and xyz corporations) terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 12/11 11:57 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gregory A Owens, Wolfgang M Florin on behalf of Plaintiff Dominic Driver. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/08 2:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood. (Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
18 18 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/29 12:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dominic Driver. (Houk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/08 3:59 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion16 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff may file his response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before November 29, 2023. There will be no further extension. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/8/2023. (KLG)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/08 10:42 AM
*MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dominic Driver.(Houk, Christopher) *Modified motion type and text on 11/8/2023 (KLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order
Monday, October 30, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 10/30 12:16 PM
ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Exceed Page Limitations13 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' Motion to Dismiss11 , filed on October 25, 2023, is deemed timely filed and is now in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/30/2023. (KLG)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/30 10:58 AM
NOTICE re: Notice of Certificate of Conferral by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood Concerning Defendant's leave to file its Motion to Dismiss . (Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion File Excess Pages Mon 10/30 10:38 AM
First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exceed page Limitations Concerning Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood.(Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 26, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/26 10:16 AM
ORDER: Defendants shall file the required certification and a motion to exceed page limitation stating the position of Plaintiff on or before November 1, 2023 or Defendants' Motion to Dismiss11 will be stricken. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/26/2023. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 10/25 12:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood.(Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Employee Hanbdbook,
Att: 2 Exhibit Employee Notice,
Att: 3 Certificate of Record Meet and Confer,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2020 payroll records,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2021 payroll records,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2022 Payroll records,
Att: 7 Exhibit return to work expectations,
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff Payroll records
Thursday, October 12, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 10/12 9:32 AM
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation9 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before October 25, 2023. There will be no further extension. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/11/23. (REK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
9 9 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Wed 10/11 12:36 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood.(Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Fri 10/06 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy F Rosini on behalf of GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood. (Rosini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney) Mon 10/02 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Christopher Robert Houk. (Houk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
misc Remark (Public) Thu 09/28 9:09 AM
Remark: Out of state attorneys Gregory A Owens and Wolfgang M Florin terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Tue 09/12 9:15 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/11/2023. (REK)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 09/12 9:13 AM
ORDER/NOTICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 12, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/11/2023. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 4:06 PM
Summons Issued as to GR Hayward Family Trust dated August 13, 2020, Good Works Auto Repair LLC, Glen Haywood, RaeAnn Haywood.(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
3 3 misc New Case Opened Mon 09/11 4:01 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22287306. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-1900 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Mon 09/11 3:59 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Dominic Driver. (Houk, Christopher)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22287306 filed by Dominic Driver. (Houk, Christopher)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet