California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:23-cv-01683
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01337873-CU-WT-WJC
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:34 AM PST
Defendant
Dairy Conveyor Corporation
Represented By
Jared L Bryan
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Philip Marcel Duclos
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
VLADAN RAKIC
Plaintiff
Jose Rodriguez
Represented By
Christopher Forbes Goodrich
Farzam Law
contact info
Christopher F Goodrich
Joseph Farzam Law Firm Aplc
contact info
Joseph S Farzam
Joseph Farzam Law Firm Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 14, 2024
38 38 misc Receipt Tue 06/18 2:23 PM
Receipt of this court's Order of Remand issued on 6/4/2024 (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
37 37 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Wed 06/05 10:20 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ORANGE. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ORANGE. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Remand Case to State Court Wed 06/05 10:07 AM
ORDER35 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Pursuant to stipulation, and good cause appearing, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is REMANDED to the California Superior Court for the County of Orange. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
35 35 stip Remand Case to State Court Tue 06/04 9:47 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez.(Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
34 34 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/28 10:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez, upon Defendant VLADAN RAKIC served on 2/22/2024, answer due 3/14/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vladan Rakic, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
33 33 order Remand Case to State Court Tue 02/27 2:53 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND [ECF No.24 ] by Judge John W. Holcomb. Once Rakic is properly served, the parties will no longer be diverse and the Court may remand this action. But until then, the action was properly removed, so remand is improper. Thus, Rodriguezs instant Motion is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
32 32 service Summons Issued Tue 02/20 8:10 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Defendant VLADAN RAKIC. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
31 31 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 02/15 1:15 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court [ECF No. 24] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing set on February 16, 2024. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Summons Request Thu 02/15 12:30 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition14 filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez. (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
29 29 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 02/02 2:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez, re Reply (Motion related)28 served on 2/2/2024. (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 02/02 12:12 PM
REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court24 filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez. (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
27 27 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 02/01 10:40 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
26 26 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 01/26 9:32 AM
Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Removed Action Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court24 filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation.(Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
25 25 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 01/16 4:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court24 served on 01/16/2024. (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Remand Case to State Court Tue 01/16 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
23 23 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 11/15 12:55 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on November 17, 2023, is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
22 22 misc Disclosure Mon 11/13 12:23 PM
Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation (Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
21 21 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 11/03 5:50 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation..(Bryan, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates
Friday, October 13, 2023
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10/13 11:42 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation [ECF No. 19], and it is hereby APPROVED. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from Friday, October 27, 2023, at 11:00 a.m., to Friday, November 17, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street Santa Ana, CA 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
19 19 stip Continue Fri 10/13 10:10 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 10/27/2023 to 11/10/2023 filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation.(Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 10/10 3:00 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition13 filed by defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation.(Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
17 17 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 10/02 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez, re Amended Complaint/Petition14 served on 10/2/2023. (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
16 16 misc Disclosure Tue 09/26 6:00 PM
DISCLOSURE of Individual's Citizenship filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/26 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez, identifying Jose Rodriguez; and Dairy Conveyor Corporation. (Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
14 14 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 09/26 5:41 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition13 , filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez(Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
13 13 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 09/25 4:03 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez(Farzam, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 09/19 10:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation.(Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 09/18 1:45 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 09/18 1:43 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
9 9 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 09/13 11:53 AM
Certificate of Service of Standing Order filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation (Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 09/11 2:07 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 09/11 2:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 09/11 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Mon 09/11 1:51 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:23-cv-1683-JWH-JDE. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation, identifying n/a. (Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation identifying n/a as Corporate Parent. (Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation. (Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01337873-CU-WT-WJC Receipt No: ACACDC-36007789 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation. (Attorney Philip Marcel Duclos added to party Dairy Conveyor Corporation(pty:dft))(Duclos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Jared Bryan,
Att: 2 Declaration Paul Calabretta
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 09/11 2:12 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Dairy Conveyor Corporation, Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Jose Rodriguez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/21/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 09/11 2:13 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Dairy Conveyor Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
Related: [-]