California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:23-cv-04622
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
California Casualty Group
Plaintiff
Terrance Turner
Service Zero Professional Services 45520 East Severn #410
Sterling, VA 20166


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
10 10 motion Report and Recommendations Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/16 9:20 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections due by 1/30/2024. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/16/2024.(ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
9 9 misc Affidavit Thu 01/11 12:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT re8 Order, The victim and subject of this case is a Korean Manchurian Candidate Clone Configurate SAP Program Operative Cloned Of HPA Lisa NoLastName by Terrance Turner. (Turner, Terrance) Modified on 1/11/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
8 8 5 pgs order Order Wed 01/10 11:20 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL FILING. (Beeler, Laurel) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 12/01 10:06 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the fact that the defendant has not appeared, the court continues the CMC from 12/7/2023 to 2/15/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/13 11:22 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Terrance Turner.. (Turner, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/12 10:11 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/11 4:47 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 09/11/2023.(ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Self Help Flyer,
Att: 2 Pro Se Handbook
Friday, September 08, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/11 2:44 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/11 2:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terrance Turner. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT against California Casualty Group. Filed by Terrance Turner. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2023.(anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope