Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047

California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:23-cv-04659
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Case in other court:South Carolina, 2:23-cv-04057
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
Defendant
Facebook Operations LLC
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
Defendant
Google LLC
Defendant
Instagram LLC
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
Defendant
Snap Inc.
Defendant
TikTok LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Defendant
Tiktok Inc.
Defendant
YouTube LLC
Defendant
Siculus Inc.
Plaintiff
Charleston County School District
Represented By
Jodi W Flowers
Motley Rice (ch)
contact info
Marlon Emil Kimpson
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Jade Haileselassie
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Marlon E Kimpson
Motley Rice
contact info
Patrick Graham Maiden
Motley Rice (mt Pl)
contact info
Previn Warren
Motley Rice LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/05 3:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT - Short Form Complaint against ByteDance Inc., Bytedance Ltd, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc., Siculus Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd, Tiktok Inc., YouTube LLC. Filed by Charleston County School District. (Warren, Previn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
12 12 misc Transcript Mon 02/05 10:16 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/26/2024, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen W. Franklin, telephone number (561)313-8439. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (Franklin, Stephen)
Related: [-] (566 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (567 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (572 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order, (571 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
11 11 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 01/26 3:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 1/25/2024. Total Time in Court: 3h 24m. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Emily Jeffcott, Thomas Huynh. Defendant Attorney: (Meta) Ashley Simonsen, Isaac Chaput, (Snap) Jonathan Blavin, (TikTok) Geoffrey Drake, Andrea Pierson, Amy Fiterman, (YouTube) Matt Donohue. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2024)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
10 10 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 12:04 PM
Transcript of Proceedings (corrected to change date on title page) held on 12/14/2023, before Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
9 9 misc Transcript Wed 12/20 11:43 AM
***PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NUMBER 511 FOR CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT. Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/14/2023, before Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2024. (rre, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/20/2023 (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (486 in 4:22-md-03047-YGR) Transcript Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
8 8 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 12/15 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Discovery Hearing held on 12/14/2023. Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Meeting: Parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding dates for fact discovery and expert discovery cut-off. This meeting must take place by January 19, 2024. Discovery Plan Proposal: A proposal for the discovery plan is due by January 19, 2024. Protective Order Briefing: Withdrawal of all briefing on the Protective Order appeal is due by December 18, 2023. Refiling of Protective Order briefing is due by December 18, 2023. No new arguments are permitted in the refiled Protective Order briefing. Defendants are allotted one page, single-spaced, to respond to State Plaintiffs' arguments on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. State Plaintiffs are allotted a half-page, single-spaced, for their proposed carve-out on the Protective Order, due by December 18, 2023. Electronic Stored Information (ESI) Conference: Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding ESI, with their ESI vendors present, by December 29, 2023, to narrow currently pending ESI issues. ESI Proposed Language Chart: The ESI proposed language chart is due by January 12, 2024. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1:11pm-2:31pm (2hr 20m). Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Seeger, Christopher Ayers, Lexi Hazam, Previn Warren, Bianca Miyata, Barney Eskandari, Megan O'Neill, Christian Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Ashley Simonsen, Greg Halperin, Isaac Chaput, Jonathan Blavin, Andrea Pierson, Christopher Chiou, Andrew Kramer, Rose Ehler, Geoffrey Drake, David Mattern, Brian Ercole, Stephanie Schuster, Laura Lopez, Paul Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2023)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 09/11 6:52 PM
Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 2:23-cv-04057. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 09/11 10:04 AM
Case transferred to Northern California per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 17. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 09/12 9:39 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3947, District of South Carolina, 2:23cv04057RMG, Charleston County School District v. Meta Platforms Inc et al, Opened in California Northern District as 4:23-cv-04659-YGR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 17 cc: JPMDL (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Charleston County School District. Snap Inc waiver executed on 8/22/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Kimpson, Marlon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
4 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (gray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
3 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County School District. (gray)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BSCDC-11267832), filed by Charleston County School District. Service due by 11/13/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]