New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:23-cv-08050
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Festool USA LLC
400 North Enterprise Boulevard
Lebanon, IN 46052
Plaintiff
Milagros Senior
On Behalf of Herself and All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates 150 East 18 Street Suite PHR
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Dana Lauren Gottlieb
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Friday, November 17, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/17 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Festool USA LLC. Document filed by Milagros Senior. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
9 9 order Order of Dismissal Thu 10/12 5:07 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and subject to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within forty-five days. All filing deadlines and conference dates are adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/12/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 10/12 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Milagros Senior..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/11 11:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Milagros Senior..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 24, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 09/24 11:07 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Festool USA LLC waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. Document filed by Milagros Senior..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 11:45 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Festool USA LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/12 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Milagros Senior..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/12 9:05 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/12 9:04 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Festool USA LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Milagros Senior..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 09/12 11:44 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 09/12 11:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 09/12 11:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/11 11:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Festool USA LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28272290)Document filed by Milagros Senior..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]