California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04662
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:05 AM PDT
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Jieying Yin
Represented By
Zheng Liu
Aptum Law
contact info
Yuxiu Fang
The Fang Law Firm, A Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/17 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jieying Yin (Liu, Zheng)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/28 7:38 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 10 Stipulation to stay proceedings. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/27 11:19 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jieying Yin.. (Fang, Yuxiu)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 11/27 6:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Jieying Yin shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/1/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
10 10 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/15 2:44 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Jieying Yin. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/15/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 11/15 2:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/22/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 11/15 2:39 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/15 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/18 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yuxiu Fang (Fang, Yuxiu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 09/12 9:53 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 09/12 9:48 AM
Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 9:37 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/12 1:53 AM
Proposed Summons. (Liu, Zheng)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 1:52 AM
COMPLAINT against USCIS ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18633201.). Filed byJieying Yin.(Liu, Zheng)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet