California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 4:23-cv-04664
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 23CV038261
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Nathaniel Le Roi Dunn
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gudelia Pinto
Represented By
Gustavo Magana, Jr.
Law Office Of Gustavo Magana
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV038261. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18633381). Filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation.(Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to RFJN - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to RFJN - Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to RFJN - Amended and Restated Articles of Incorporation,
Att: 5 Declaration of Nathaniel L. Dunn in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Dunn Dec - Return of Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Dunn Dec. - Requests for Admission,
Att: 8 Exhibit C to Dunn Dec. - Request for Statement of Damages,
Att: 9 Exhibit D to Dunn Dec. - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages,
Att: 10 Exhibit E to Dunn Dec. - Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admission,
Att: 11 Exhibit F to Dunn Dec. - Member First Report of Incident,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 Answer to Removal Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/12/2023 (cv, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]