California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 4:23-cv-04665
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Zahid SABRI
Represented By
Stefanos Georgousopoulos
Syg Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Georgousopoulos, Stefanos)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18634142.). Filed byZahid SABRI.(Georgousopoulos, Stefanos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Second page shows list of defendants to be serve. We do not issue summons to DOES. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Zahid SABRI (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]