California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 3:23-cv-04666
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Mohamed H Mosleh
Defendant
Royal Kutz LLC
Plaintiff
Richard Sepulveda
Represented By
Richard Allen Mac Bride
Law Offices Of Richard A. Mac Bride
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18634564.). Filed byRichard Sepulveda.(Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet