California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Referred: Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 4:23-cv-04663
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
Represented By
Angela Lucille Dunning
Cooley LLP
contact info
Angela Dunning
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Bobby A. Ghajar
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Chabon
Represented By
Bryan L. Clobes
Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP
contact info
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Henry Hwang
Represented By
Bryan L. Clobes
Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP
contact info
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Klam
Represented By
Bryan L. Clobes
Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP
contact info
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Louise Snyder
Represented By
Bryan L. Clobes
Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP
contact info
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ayelet Waldman
Represented By
Bryan L. Clobes
Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP
contact info
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ta-Nehisi Coates
Represented By
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Junot Diaz
Represented By
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Sean Greer
Represented By
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura Lippman
Represented By
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Woodson
Represented By
Daniel Jerome Muller
Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/20 8:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 8:05 AM
Proposed Summons. (Muller, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/12 10:12 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 8:45 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 7:55 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18633331.). Filed byRachel Louise Snyder, Michael Chabon, Matthew Klam, David Henry Hwang, Ayelet Waldman.(Muller, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet