California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:23-cv-04666
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:07 AM PDT
Defendant
Mohamed H Mosleh
Defendant
Royal Kutz LLC
Plaintiff
Richard Sepulveda
Represented By
Richard Allen Mac Bride
Law Offices Of Richard A. Mac Bride
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/02 8:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Sepulveda (Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 09/06 10:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore. In light of the settlement, the Court terminates 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff may re-file the motion if needed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Thu 08/29 7:41 PM
STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's status report by Richard Sepulveda. (Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
19 19 order Status Report Order Thu 08/15 2:19 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report or a notice of settlement by 8/29/2024. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/15/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 06/26 9:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: You are hereby notified that the hearing set for 6/27/2024 at 1:30pm (INSERT DATE & TIME) re:12 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to all defendants is vacated based on17 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 06/20 4:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by Richard Sepulveda. (Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/01 11:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING: Parties are hereby notified that the motion hearing previously set for 6/20/2024 as to12 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to all defendants is reset to 6/27/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/18 2:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 4/18/2024. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom: 1:37pm - 1:45pm. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
14 14 order Order Fri 03/29 3:27 PM
ORDER requiring Plaintiff to email Word (.docx) version of their moving papers for 12 MOTION for Default Judgment and the Proposed Order to kawpo@cand.uscourts.gov by 4/5/2024. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/29/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/15 11:25 AM
Clerk's Notice Resetting12 Motion for Default Judgment: Parties are hereby notified that the motion hearing previously set for 3/21/2024 is continued to 4/18/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore, this proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom guidance and setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
12 12 motion Default Judgment - by the Court Tue 02/06 9:51 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to all defendants filed by Richard Sepulveda. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing set for 3/21/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 2/20/2024. Replies due by 2/27/2024.(Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, December 14, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/14 2:08 PM
ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 10 , Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/14/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Wed 12/13 6:38 PM
Clerk's Notice of ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Mohamed H Mosleh and Royal Kutz LLC. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)9
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
9 9 motion Entry of Default Tue 12/05 10:58 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as against all defendants filed by Richard Sepulveda.(Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, November 06, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/06 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Sepulveda. All Defendants. (Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 5:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Sepulveda.. (Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 09/27 9:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/13 8:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Mohamed H Mosleh, Royal Kutz LLC. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Wed 09/13 8:05 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 11:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/12 10:47 AM
Proposed Summons. (Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18634564.). Filed byRichard Sepulveda.(Mac Bride, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet