California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:23-cv-04673
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
James Wyrough
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Menahem Shalit
Represented By
Jennifer Leah Rozdzielski
Jr Immigration Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Yosef Weintraub
Represented By
Jennifer Leah Rozdzielski
Jr Immigration Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 16, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/16 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Menahem Shalit, Yosef Weintraub (Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/06 5:01 PM
ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on November 6, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/06 12:56 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response filed by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, James Wyrough. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/06 12:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, James Wyrough.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/06 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 09/27 4:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Menahem Shalit, Yosef Weintraub. All Defendants. (Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 09/27 2:27 PM
***Filing Error. Incorrect Event Used. Disregard*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Menahem Shalit, Yosef Weintraub (Rozdzielski, Jennifer) Modified Text on 9/27/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 09/27 3:28 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] To notify the court of a Return of Service of process please select the appropriate event (e.g. Summons Returned Executed or Unexecuted). Please re-file in its entirety.*** Re:8 Certificate of Service filed by Menahem Shalit, Yosef Weintraub (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 09/19 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, James Wyrough, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 7:28 AM
Proposed Summons.(Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/13 11:56 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Menahem Shalit, Yosef Weintraub.. (Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 09/13 11:13 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 3:01 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/12 12:59 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by MENAHEM SHALIT, YOSEF WEINTAUB . (Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18635582.). Filed byMENAHEM SHALIT, YOSEF WEINTAUB.(Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B