Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Stephanie L Haines
Case #: 3:23-cv-00214
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 7:21 AM EDT
Defendant
JORDAN CLARK
Represented By
Dana W. Horton
Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers
contact info
Terrance R. Henne
Mintzer Sarowitz Zeris Ledva & Meyers
contact info
Defendant
PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
Dana W. Horton
Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers
contact info
Terrance R. Henne
Mintzer Sarowitz Zeris Ledva & Meyers
contact info
Mediator
EUGENE F. SCANLON, JR.
Represented By
Eugene F. Scanlon, Jr.
Scanlon Adr Services
contact info
Plaintiff
DESHNY DOR
Represented By
Ryan R Jablonski
Ostroff Injury
contact info
Ryan Michaleski
Ostroff Law, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
RICARDO MONDESIR
Represented By
Ryan R Jablonski
Ostroff Injury
contact info
Ryan Michaleski
Ostroff Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
24 24 misc Praecipe to Settle and Discontinue Wed 04/10 12:30 PM
Praecipe to Settle and Discontinue by DESHNY DOR, RICARDO MONDESIR. (Jablonski, Ryan)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No signature s/ Wed 04/10 3:25 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re24 Praecipe to Settle and Discontinue. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. (kss)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order for Administrative Case Closing Mon 12/11 3:01 PM
ORDER OF COURT - Upon the Court having been advised that a settlement has been reached in this case, and the only remaining matter being the submission of a stipulation of settlement and dismissal; accordingly, with no further action being required by the Court at this time, the following order is entered: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove this case from the docket for administrative purposes, and as more fully stated in said Order of Court. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 12/11/2023. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
22 22 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 12/08 10:16 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION - Mediation. Eugene Scanlon is appointed as mediator. The ADR Conference shall be concluded on or before January 3, 2024, unless extended by Order of the Court. It is the responsibility of counsel to ensure that notice of the date, time and location of the mediation has been electronically filed with the Court on or before December 3, 2023, and as more fully stated in said Order Referring Case to ADR. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 12/8/2023. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
21 21 order Case Management Order Mon 12/04 2:25 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: It is Ordered that compliance with the provisions of Local Rule 16.1 shall be completed as follows: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2023. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by 7/31/2024. Expert Discovery to be completed by 11/30/2024. Expert Depositions to be completed by 9/30/2024. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 8/29/2024 at 1:30 PM, and as more fully stated in said Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 12/4/2023. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
20 20 misc Proposed Initial Scheduling Order Fri 12/01 2:46 PM
Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by DESHNY DOR, RICARDO MONDESIR. (kss)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Fri 12/01 12:59 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DESHNY DOR, RICARDO MONDESIR. (Jablonski, Ryan) Proposed Order removed from public view and refiled at20 . Modified text on 12/1/2023. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc QC - Document should have been filed as 2 separate documents QC - Outdated form - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process Fri 12/01 2:50 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re19 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Proposed Initial Scheduling Order. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re19 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Stipulation Selecting ADR Process form is outdated. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to use the updated Stipulation Selecting ADR Process form, with the revision date of 4/2017, for future filings. The updated form can be found at the court's website, under the Forms link, at[LINK:here] . This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
18 18 minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Thu 11/30 3:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephanie L. Haines: Telephonic Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference held on 11/30/2023. Court convened for telephone initial case management conference. Counsel entered appearances. Counsel for both parties summarized their positions on the case. The Court directed the parties to file no later than close of business tomorrow - December 1, 2023 - a proposed initial scheduling order and an ADR Stipulation. The Court will set a post-discovery status conference approximately 30 days after close of fact discovery. The Court advised the parties to meet and confer on any discovery disputes that may arise and, if issue cannot be resolved informally, to contact chambers to set up a phone conference prior to filing any discovery-related motions. Appropriate orders to follow. Conference adjourned. (Court Reporter: Shirley Hall) (dag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 11/22 12:18 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Horton, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 11/08 4:49 PM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by JORDAN CLARK, PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC.. (Henne, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 23, 2023
15 15 order Case Management Order Mon 10/23 4:21 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held on Thursday, November 30, 2023, at 11:30 A.M. In order to further public health and safety and minimize travel by participants, the Court will conduct the case management conference via an AT&T call-in number, which requires participants to dial in and provide an access code. The Court will provide the dial in number and access code via an email to all counsel, and as more fully stated in said Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 10/23/2023. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process,
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/23 10:31 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint, and New Matter by JORDAN CLARK, PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC. (Henne, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2) QC - No signature s/ Mon 10/23 2:26 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re14 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party (JORDAN CLARK only) did not file disclosure statement identifying CITIZENSHIP pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)).(Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2023.) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re14 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. (kss)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Fri 10/13 11:59 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC. (Henne, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 02, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R Jablonski on behalf of DESHNY DOR, RICARDO MONDESIR. (Jablonski, Ryan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance R. Henne on behalf of JORDAN CLARK, PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC. (Henne, Terrance)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dana W. Horton on behalf of JORDAN CLARK, PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC. (Horton, Dana)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND FRCvP 7.1(a)(2) Mon 10/02 3:45 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re11 Notice of Appearance,10 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying CITIZENSHIP pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 10/10/2023. (kss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to JORDAN CLARK (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
7 7 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Mon 09/18 11:04 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DESHNY DOR, RICARDO MONDESIR (Michaleski, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
6 6 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Wed 09/13 10:17 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DESHNY DOR, RICARDO MONDESIR (Michaleski, Ryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/13 10:07 AM
ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 09/13/2023. (dag)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice of ADR Designation Wed 09/13 10:04 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 09/13 10:00 AM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by DESHNY DOR, RICARDO MONDESIR. (Michaleski, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 09/13 8:10 AM
Summons Issued as to PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC. (kss)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2) Wed 09/13 8:12 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 9/20/2023. (kss)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Praecipe to Issue Summons Wed 09/13 2:17 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re6 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: The summons was filed as the main document. CORRECTION: Attorney to refile the document with a Praecipe to Issue Summons as the main document and the properly filled out summons (with attorney information added) as an attachment to the Praecipe, using the Praecipe to Issue Summons event. (kss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 09/13 8:08 AM
COMPLAINT against JORDAN CLARK, PULLEN MOVING COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7878207), filed by RICARDO MONDESIR, DESHNY DOR. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/13 8:05 AM
Judge Stephanie L. Haines added. (kss)
Related: [-]