California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04676
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Danielle E. Lehman
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Xijun Xu
Represented By
Justin X. Wang
Baughman & Wang
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 12, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/12 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xijun Xu (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/20 5:03 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 11 Stipulation to stay proceedings. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/17 10:12 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 11/17 10:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 10:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 09/21 12:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xijun Xu. Ur M. Jaddou served on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Danielle E. Lehman served on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 10:42 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Xijun Xu.. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 09/12 7:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 09/12 7:07 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/12 2:04 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 09/12 1:24 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Xijun Xu (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/12 1:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/12 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18635647.). Filed byXijun Xu.(Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet